This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/16/2022 at 12:55:23 (UTC).

FAKLA v. BOROUGH OF MIDDLESEX et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 FAKLA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against BOROUGH OF MIDDLESEX. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kevin McNulty and Edward S. Kiel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-04126

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kevin McNulty

Referral Judge

Edward S. Kiel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN FAKLA

Defendants

BOROUGH OF MIDDLESEX

MIDDLESEX BOROUGH POLICE DEPARTMENT

MATTHEW GEIST

MARK MELCHIORRE

MIDDLESEX COUNTY

MIDDLESEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE

MARTHA MCKINNEY

PROSECUTOR BRIAN GILLET

CHRISTOPHER VANEERDE

ANN KLEIN FORENSIC CENTER

JOHN DOES 1-10

JANE DOES 1-10

ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10

ABC PUBLIC ENTITIES 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JORDAN PATRICK BREWSTER

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JORDAN P. BREWSTER

14 Pine Street, Suite 7

Morristown, NJ 07960

Defendant Attorneys

JOHN WARREN HARDING

Attorney at MARTIN, KANE & KUPER, ESQS.

180 Tices Lane

BARKHA PATEL

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

25 W. Market Street, P.O. Box 116

Trenton, NJ 08625

MICHAEL RALPH SARNO

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR NEW JERSEY

25 Market Street, P.O. Box 116

Trenton, NJ 08625

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10, ABC PUBLIC ENTITIES 1-10, ANN KLEIN FORENSIC CENTER, BOROUGH OF MIDDLESEX, MATTHEW GEIST, BRIAN GILLET, JANE DOES 1-10, JOHN DOES 1-10, MARTHA MCKINNEY, MARK MELCHIORRE, MIDDLESEX BOROUGH POLICE DEPARTMENT, MIDDLESEX COUNTY, MIDDLESEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, CHRISTOPHER VANEERDE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13495182) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JOHN FAKLA.(BREWSTER, JORDAN) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#2

(#2) Exhibit to QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44,, #1 Complaint, by JOHN FAKLA. (BREWSTER, JORDAN) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ANN KLEIN FORENSIC CENTER, BOROUGH OF MIDDLESEX, MATTHEW GEIST, BRIAN GILLET, MARTHA MCKINNEY, MARK MELCHIORRE, MIDDLESEX BOROUGH POLICE DEPARTMENT, MIDDLESEX COUNTY, MIDDLESEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, CHRISTOPHER VANEERDE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, ) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by BARKHA PATEL on behalf of BRIAN GILLET, MARTHA MCKINNEY, MIDDLESEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, CHRISTOPHER VANEERDE (PATEL, BARKHA) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

#5

(#5) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants Middlesex County Prosecutor's Office, Gillet, McKinney, and Van Eerde. Attorney BARKHA PATEL for BRIAN GILLET,BARKHA PATEL for MARTHA MCKINNEY,BARKHA PATEL for MIDDLESEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE,BARKHA PATEL for CHRISTOPHER VANEERDE added. (PATEL, BARKHA) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL RALPH SARNO on behalf of ANN KLEIN FORENSIC CENTER (SARNO, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

#7

(#7) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Ann Klein Forensic Center. Attorney MICHAEL RALPH SARNO for ANN KLEIN FORENSIC CENTER added. (SARNO, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN WARREN HARDING on behalf of MIDDLESEX COUNTY (HARDING, JOHN) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by MIDDLESEX COUNTY.(HARDING, JOHN) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by MIDDLESEX COUNTY.(HARDING, JOHN) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The document submitted by ANN KLEIN FORENSIC CENTER has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/23/2022. (nic, ) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The document submitted by MIDDLESEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, BRIAN GILLET, MARTHA MCKINNEY, CHRISTOPHER VANEERDE has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/26/2022. (nic, ) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN WARREN HARDING on behalf of MIDDLESEX COUNTY (HARDING, JOHN) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Ann Klein Forensic Center. Attorney MICHAEL RALPH SARNO for ANN KLEIN FORENSIC CENTER added. (SARNO, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL RALPH SARNO on behalf of ANN KLEIN FORENSIC CENTER (SARNO, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants Middlesex County Prosecutor's Office, Gillet, McKinney, and Van Eerde. Attorney BARKHA PATEL for BRIAN GILLET,BARKHA PATEL for MARTHA MCKINNEY,BARKHA PATEL for MIDDLESEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE,BARKHA PATEL for CHRISTOPHER VANEERDE added. (PATEL, BARKHA) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by BARKHA PATEL on behalf of BRIAN GILLET, MARTHA MCKINNEY, MIDDLESEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, CHRISTOPHER VANEERDE (PATEL, BARKHA) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ANN KLEIN FORENSIC CENTER, BOROUGH OF MIDDLESEX, MATTHEW GEIST, BRIAN GILLET, MARTHA MCKINNEY, MARK MELCHIORRE, MIDDLESEX BOROUGH POLICE DEPARTMENT, MIDDLESEX COUNTY, MIDDLESEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, CHRISTOPHER VANEERDE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, ) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketJudge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Exhibit to QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44,, #1 Complaint, by JOHN FAKLA. (BREWSTER, JORDAN) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ps) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10, ABC PUBLIC ENTITIES 1-10, ANN KLEIN FORENSIC CENTER, BOROUGH OF MIDDLESEX, MATTHEW GEIST, BRIAN GILLET, JANE DOES 1-10, JOHN DOES 1-10, MARTHA MCKINNEY, MARK MELCHIORRE, MIDDLESEX BOROUGH POLICE DEPARTMENT, MIDDLESEX COUNTY, MIDDLESEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, CHRISTOPHER VANEERDE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13495182) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JOHN FAKLA.(BREWSTER, JORDAN) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABC PUBLIC ENTITY/AGENCY 1-10 is a litigant

Latest cases where ANN KLEIN FORENSIC CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where MIDDLESEX COUNTY PROSECUTORS OFFICE is a litigant

Latest cases where MIDDLESEX COUNTY is a litigant