This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/20/2023 at 09:42:14 (UTC).

Fakhoury v. Juul Labs Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/22/2022 Fakhoury filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Juul Labs Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-09086

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Albert Fakhoury

Defendants

Juul Labs Inc.

Altria Group, Inc.

Philip Morris USA Inc.

Altria Client Services LLC

Altria Group Distribution Company

Altria Enterprises LLC

James Monsees

Adam Bowen

Nicholas Pritzker

HUH HOYOUNG

Riaz Valani

MOTHER MURPHYS LABS, INC..

Alternative Ingredients Inc

Tobacco Technology, Inc.

eliquidtech, Inc.

McLane Company, Inc.

Eby-Brown Company, LLC

Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc

Chevron Corporation

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shana P. Nogues

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Nogues, Shana) (Filed on 12/26/2022) (Entered: 12/26/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to 7-Eleven, Inc., Alternative Ingredients Inc, Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Chevron Corporation, Circle K Stores Inc., Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc, Eby-Brown Company, LLC, HUH HOYOUNG, Juul Labs Inc., MOTHER MURPHYS LABS, INC.., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Philip Morris USA Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Speedway LLC, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Walmart, eliquidtech, Inc.. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2022) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to 7-Eleven, Inc., Alternative Ingredients Inc, Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Chevron Corporation, Circle K Stores Inc., Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc, Eby-Brown Company, LLC, HUH HOYOUNG, Juul Labs Inc., MOTHER MURPHYS LABS, INC.., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Philip Morris USA Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Speedway LLC, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Walmart, eliquidtech, Inc.. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2022) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Nogues, Shana) (Filed on 12/26/2022) (Entered: 12/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2022) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketMEMBER CASE OPENED:,, Fakhoury v. Juul Labs Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 22-cv-09086 cc: JPMDL (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2022) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT - SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FILE BY PLAINTIFF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17849928.). Filed byJohn Albert Fakhoury. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nogues, Shana) (Filed on 12/22/2022) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less