This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:29:23 (UTC).

Faith Temple Inc v. Church Mutual Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Faith Temple Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Church Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles Goodwin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00013

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles Goodwin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Faith Temple Inc

Defendants

Lisa M Holliday

Church Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Rusty Smith

Attorney at Rusty Smith Law Group PLLC

555 W Okmulgee

Muskogee, OK 74401

Ben D Baker

Attorney at Ben Baker Attorney at Law

109 N Second

Purcell, OK 73080

A Laurie Koller

Attorney at Koller Trial Law PLLC

320 South Boston, Suite 1130

Tulsa, OK 74103

Eric Anthony Mareshie

Attorney at E Anthony Mareshie PLLC

Po Box 330161

Tulsa, OK 74133-0161

Defendant Attorneys

Kenyatta R Bethea

Attorney at Holloway Bethea & Osenbaugh PLLC

3035 Nw 63Rd, Suite 102 N

Oklahoma City, OK 73116

David A Ward, Jr

Attorney at Ward Law Firm

10077 Grogran'S Mill Rd, Suite 540

The Woodlands, TX 77380

Matthew K Felty

Attorney at Lytle Soule & Felty PC

119 N Robinson Ave, Suite 1200

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Ward shall register to file documents electronically in this district, see LCvR 83.2(g), on or before March 17, 2020, and shall file an entry of appearance, see id. R. 83.4, by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 03/04/2020. (jb) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

3 #1

Exhibit 1 - Petition

#23

(#23) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Church Mutual Insurance Company . (Bethea, Kenyatta) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

18 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1-Affidavit of Brian Johnson

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#10

(#15) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support filed by Lisa M Holliday. (Felty, Matthew) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 Petition

19 #1

Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice

3 #2

Exhibit 2 - Amended Petition

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Cleveland County, case number CJ-2019-1363 filed by Lisa M Holliday, Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 Amended Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 Second Amended Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 Docket Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#22

(#22) ENTRY of Appearance by David A Ward, Jr on behalf of Lisa M Holliday (Ward, David) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit 3 Second Amended Petition

1 #4

Exhibit 4 Docket Sheet

#20

(#20) ORDER. Faith Temple Inc. and Defendant Church Mutual Insurance Company shall file their disclosure statements within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 03/04/2020. (jb) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#2

(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew K Felty on behalf of Lisa M Holliday (Felty, Matthew) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

10 #1

Exhibit 1-Insurance Pages

#19

(#19) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3110151 by Lisa M Holliday. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Felty, Matthew) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 Amended Petition

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Church Mutual Insurance Company . (Bethea, Kenyatta) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ENTRY of Appearance by David A Ward, Jr on behalf of Lisa M Holliday (Ward, David) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Ward shall register to file documents electronically in this district, see LCvR 83.2(g), on or before March 17, 2020, and shall file an entry of appearance, see id. R. 83.4, by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 03/04/2020. (jb) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER. Faith Temple Inc. and Defendant Church Mutual Insurance Company shall file their disclosure statements within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 03/04/2020. (jb) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3110151 by Lisa M Holliday. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Felty, Matthew) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Affidavit of Brian Johnson)(Mareshie, Eric) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Affidavit of Brian Johnson, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2-Jonnada Amended Complaint)(Mareshie, Eric) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support filed by Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Bethea, Kenyatta) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support filed by Lisa M Holliday. (Felty, Matthew) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Bethea, Kenyatta) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition and #5 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses re #3 due by 2/10/2020. Responses re #5 due by 2/17/2020. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 01/29/2020. (jb) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss , #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition by All Plaintiffs. (Koller, A) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Eric Anthony Mareshie on behalf of Faith Temple Inc (Mareshie, Eric) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ENTRY of Appearance by A Laurie Koller on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Koller, A) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Dismiss by Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Bethea, Kenyatta) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Kenyatta R Bethea on behalf of Church Mutual Insurance Company (Bethea, Kenyatta) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition by Lisa M Holliday. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Second Amended Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 - Wallace Opinion, #5 Exhibit 5 - Hightower Opinion)(Felty, Matthew) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew K Felty on behalf of Lisa M Holliday (Felty, Matthew) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3069406. (Bethea, Kenyatta) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Cleveland County, case number CJ-2019-1363 filed by Lisa M Holliday, Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 Amended Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 Second Amended Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 Docket Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.