This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/03/2023 at 07:40:17 (UTC).

FAIRWEATHER et al v. BAUSMAN et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 FAIRWEATHER filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against BAUSMAN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is GENE E.K. PRATTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-04428

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GENE E.K. PRATTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TYRONE FAIRWEATHER

NIECIA WEST

Defendants

KATHLEEN BAUSMAN

UR M. JADDOU

ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL S. HENRY

Defendant Attorney

MARK J. SHERER

 

Court Documents

#1

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER THAT MS. BAUSMAN, MS. JADDOU, AND MR. MAYORKAS HAVE UNTIL 3/14/2023 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 12/6/22. 12/6/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER THAT MS. BAUSMAN, MS. JADDOU, AND MR. MAYORKAS HAVE UNTIL 3/14/2023 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 12/6/22. 12/6/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by MARK J. SHERER on behalf of KATHLEEN BAUSMAN, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS with Certificate of Service(SHERER, MARK) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (amas) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to KATHLEEN BAUSMAN, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: US ATTY on 11/7/22 (amas) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16293626.), filed by Tyrone Fairweather, Niecia West.(HENRY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less