This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/07/2020 at 15:41:51 (UTC).

Fairview Health Services v. Quest Software Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 Fairview Health Services filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Quest Software Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Leo I. Brisbois and Susan Richard Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-01326

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Leo I. Brisbois

Presiding Judge

Susan Richard Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Fairview Health Services

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Quest Software Inc.

One Identity LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Kathryn A Stephens

Attorney at Rock Hutchinson, PLLP

120 S. 6Th St., Suite 2050

Minneapolis, MN 55402

John Rock

Attorney at Rock Hutchinson, PLLP

120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2050

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Benjamin W Hulse

Attorney at Blackwell Burke PA

431 S 7Th St Ste 2500

Mpls, MN 55415

Bradford J Axel

Attorney at Stokes Lawrence, P.S.

1420 Fifth Avenue, Ste 3000

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

#17

16 #4

Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit 4

16 #3

Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit 3

16 #2

Exhibit(s) 2

16 #1

Exhibit(s) 1

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#9

#8

#6

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REPORT ON FILING OF COPYRIGHT ACTION (The Clerk's Office will mail a copy of the AO 121 and the Complaint to the U.S Copyright Office.). cc: Copyright Office. (Hulse, Benjamin) Modified text on 7/28/2020 (CLK). (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant One Identity LLC. (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Quest Software Inc.. (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Fairview Health Services. filed by Quest Software Inc., One Identity LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit 4) (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Summons Issued as to One Identity LLC, Quest Software Inc. (CLK) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Fairview Health Services. Filer requests summons issued. (Rock, John) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER on #11 Stipulation. Quest Software Inc. answer due 7/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 7/13/2020.(JLB) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 Stipulation. (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Time to Answer by Quest Software Inc.. Jointly Signed by Fairview Health Services. (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bradford J Axel for Quest Software Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/30/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bradford J. Axel. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7838495 filed by Quest Software Inc.. (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER on #6 Stipulation. Quest Software Inc. answer due 7/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/29/2020.(JLB) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint by Quest Software Inc.. Jointly Signed by Fairview Health Services. (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fairview Health Services. Quest Software Inc. served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020. (Rock, John) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Quest Software Inc. (MTP) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 20-cv-01326 SRN/LIB. (MTP) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Fairview Health Services. (Rock, John) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Quest Software Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7782831) filed by Fairview Health Services. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rock, John) Modified text on 6/8/2020 (CLK). (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less