This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2020 at 09:04:23 (UTC).

Fairfield University v. Vigilant Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 Fairfield University filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Vigilant Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Janet C. Hall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01369

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Janet C. Hall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fairfield University

Defendants

Federal Insurance Company

Vigilant Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tracy Alan Saxe

William S. Bennett

Celia B. Waters

Defendant Attorneys

Dennis O. Brown

Kelcie Burns Reid

Michael Pollard Thompson

 

Court Documents

#21

20 #1

Memorandum in Support

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/12/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Count Three of the Complaint. Responses due by 12/7/2020. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/12/2020. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/11/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Count Three of the Complaint until December 7, 2020 by Fairfield University. (Saxe, Tracy) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) MOTION to Dismiss Count Three of the Complaint by Federal Insurance Company, Vigilant Insurance Company.Responses due by 11/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Brown, Dennis) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelcie Burns Reid on behalf of Federal Insurance Company, Vigilant Insurance Company (Reid, Kelcie) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis O. Brown on behalf of Federal Insurance Company, Vigilant Insurance Company (Brown, Dennis) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) NOTICE of Related Case by Fairfield University (Saxe, Tracy) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2020

DocketAnswer deadline updated for Federal Insurance Company to 11/5/2020; Vigilant Insurance Company to 11/5/2020. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) ORDER granting #10 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 5, 2020 to file a Responsive Pleading by Federal Insurance Company, Vigilant Insurance Company. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/5/2020. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) Document #13 Corrected: SUMMONS Returned Executed Federal Insurance Company served on 9/15/2020, answer due 10/6/2020; Vigilant Insurance Company served on 9/15/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by William S. Bennett on behalf of Fairfield University (Bennett, William) (Entered: 10/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
09/15/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Fairfield University, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Fairfield University, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order, #6 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 9/15/2020. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/14/2020. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/14/2020. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/14/2020. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/13/2020. Discovery due by 3/16/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 4/20/2021. Signed by Clerk on 9/14/2020. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020

DocketJudge Janet C. Hall added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fairfield University. (Saxe, Tracy) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020

DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to Vigilant Insurance Company. (Saxe, Tracy) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020

DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to Federal Insurance Company. (Saxe, Tracy) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6092346.), filed by Fairfield University.(Saxe, Tracy) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less