This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:42:22 (UTC).

In Re: Fairfield Sentry Limited

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 In Re Fairfield Sentry Limited was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vernon S. Broderick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04567

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vernon S. Broderick

 

Party Details

Appellants

Fairfield Sentry Limited (In Liquidation)

Kenneth Krys

In Re and Debtor

Fairfield Sentry Limited, et al.

Appellee

Banque SCS Alliance SA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Ronald John Krock, II

Attorney at Selendy & Gay PLLC

1290 Avenue Of The Americas, New York

New York, NY 10104

Yelena Konanova

Attorney at Selendy & Gay PLLC

1290 Avenue Of The Americas, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10104

David Lawrence Elsberg

Attorney at Selendy & Gay, PLLC

1290 Avenue Of The Americas, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10104

David J. Molton

Attorney at Brown Rudnick LLP (NYC)

Seven Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Marek Patrick Krzyzowski

Attorney at Brown Rudnick LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Appellee Attorneys

Lauren Jill Pincus

Attorney at Allegaert Berger & Vogel LLP

111 Broadway

New York, NY 10006

Bianca Lin

Attorney at Allegaert Berger & Vogel LLP

111 Broadway, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

John F. Zulack

Attorney at Allegaert Berger & Vogel LLP

111 Broadway, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-03911. Document filed by Fairfield Sentry Limited (In Liquidation), Kenneth Krys.(Molton, David) (Entered: 05/18/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Stuart M. Bernstein dated 04/04/2019. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 11-01256A (SMB), 10-B-13164 (SMB). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Fairfield Sentry Limited (In Liquidation), Kenneth Krys. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(bmlo) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bmlo) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #1

Schedule A

1 #4

Exhibit C

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-03911-VSB. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-03911. Document filed by Fairfield Sentry Limited (In Liquidation), Kenneth Krys.(Molton, David) (Entered: 05/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (bmlo) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • BANKRUPTCY APPEAL CASE REFERRED BY ATTORNEY TO Judge Vernon S. Broderick as possibly related to 19-cv-3911. (bmlo) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bmlo) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Stuart M. Bernstein dated 04/04/2019. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 11-01256A (SMB), 10-B-13164 (SMB). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Fairfield Sentry Limited (In Liquidation), Kenneth Krys. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(bmlo) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.