Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/22/2021 at 09:29:03 (UTC).

Fairchild v. Wyze Labs Inc et al

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 Fairchild filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Wyze Labs Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard A. Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00397

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard A. Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alison Helen Fairchild

Pasadena, CA 91106

Defendants

Los Angeles County Sheriff Deputy 3

Does 1-10

Dave Crosby

John Doe

Los Angeles County Sheriff Deputy 4

Sobi Investments LLC

Deanne Castorena

Randy Galindo

Nitin Bhanubhai Solanki

Grubhub LLC

Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department

Jane Doe

Solanki

Doe

Evergreen Inn

Los Angeles County Sheriff Deputy 2

Jacquelyn Lacey

Yun Zhang

Los Angeles County

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

E-Filing/Service

Defendant Attorneys

Adam T Pankratz

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART (SEA)

1201 Third Avenue, Ste 5150

Seattle, WA 98101

Bensy Benjamin

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART (SEA)

1201 Third Avenue, Ste 5150

Seattle, WA 98101

Other Attorneys

Lauren Jeffers Tsuji

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Eric J Weiss

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) REPLY, filed by Defendant Grubhub LLC, TO RESPONSE to #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Benjamin, Bensy) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

19 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

19 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#19

(#19) DECLARATION of Adam T. Pankratz filed by Defendant Grubhub LLC re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Benjamin, Bensy) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

18 #5

Exhibit 5

18 #3

Exhibit 3

#18

(#18) NOTICE re Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Grubhub's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ; filed by Defendant Grubhub LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Benjamin, Bensy) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

17 #1

Proposed Order

#17

(#17) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant Grubhub LLC. Noting Date 5/21/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Benjamin, Bensy) Modified on 4/28/2021 (MW). (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#7

(#7) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Grubhub LLC (Springfield, IL), Just Eat Takeaway.com NV. (MW) (Issued Summonses mailed to Plaintiff) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Dave Crosby, Grubhub LLC (MW) (Issued Summonses mailed to Plaintiff) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Wyze Labs Inc (MW) (Issued Summons mailed to Plaintiff) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (VE) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#3

(#12) MINUTE ORDER authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones granting #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint, filed by Defendant Wyze Labs Inc. The deadline for Defendant Wyze Labs Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 5/27/2021. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (VE) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Proposed Document(s). ***Action Required*** Filing Fee Not Paid.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 4/23/2021 to correct (CDA)cc plaintiff via US Mail (Entered: 03/24/2021)

1 #2

Email transmittal

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#2) Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Proposed Document(s). ***Action Required*** Filing Fee Not Paid.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 4/23/2021 to correct (CDA)cc plaintiff via US Mail (Entered: 03/24/2021)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPLY, filed by Defendant Grubhub LLC, TO RESPONSE to #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Benjamin, Bensy) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNoting Date Set/Reset re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM: Noting Date 5/21/2021 (MW) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) DECLARATION of Adam T. Pankratz filed by Defendant Grubhub LLC re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Benjamin, Bensy) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE re Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Grubhub's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ; filed by Defendant Grubhub LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Benjamin, Bensy) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant Grubhub LLC. Noting Date 5/21/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Benjamin, Bensy) Modified on 4/28/2021 (MW). (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE: Plaintiff Alison Helen Fairchild has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (STP) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Bensy Benjamin on behalf of Defendant Grubhub LLC. (Benjamin, Bensy) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Grubhub LLC (Pankratz, Adam) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Adam T Pankratz on behalf of Defendant Grubhub LLC. (Pankratz, Adam) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones granting #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint, filed by Defendant Wyze Labs Inc. The deadline for Defendant Wyze Labs Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 5/27/2021. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (VE) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Nitin Bhanubhai Solanki (MW) (Issued Summonses mailed to Plaintiff) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Grubhub, Inc (Delaware), Wyze Labs Inc (Delaware) (MW) (Issued Summonses mailed to Plaintiff) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Grubhub LLC (Springfield, IL), Just Eat Takeaway.com NV. (MW) (Issued Summonses mailed to Plaintiff) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Dave Crosby, Grubhub LLC (MW) (Issued Summonses mailed to Plaintiff) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Wyze Labs Inc (MW) (Issued Summons mailed to Plaintiff) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (VE) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Summons(es) not received to issue) (Receipt # TAC016620), filed by Alison Helen Fairchild.(MW) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketFILING FEE RECEIVED: $ 402.00, Receipt Number TAC016620. (GMR) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Proposed Document(s). ***Action Required*** Filing Fee Not Paid.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 4/23/2021 to correct (CDA)cc plaintiff via US Mail (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PROPOSED Complaint filed by Plaintiff Alison Helen Fairchild (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Email transmittal)(CDA) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Los Angeles County Sheriff Deputy 3 is a litigant

Latest cases where SOLANKI AS TRUSTEE OF THE EGST TRUSTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF SAREE SOLANKI SAREE is a litigant

Latest cases where GRUBHUB INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where : LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT TASKFORCE FOR REGIONAL AUTOTHEFT PREVENTION is a litigant