This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/08/2021 at 03:07:12 (UTC).

Fairchild v. Los Angeles County et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 Fairchild filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Los Angeles County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gonzalo P. Curiel and Karen S. Crawford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00496

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gonzalo P. Curiel

Referral Judge

Karen S. Crawford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alison Helen Fairchild

Pasadena, CA 91106

Defendants

Does 1-10

Lieutenant Doe

John Doe (room 104)

Sobi Investments, LLC

Michael Doe Defendant

Evergreen Inn Motel

Los Angeles County

Mrs. Solanki

Los Angeles County District Attorney's Office

Captain Andy Berg

Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department Sheriff Alex Villanueva

Jane Doe (room 106)

Sergeant White

Nitin Bhanubhai Solanki

Grubhub LLC

Just Eat Takeaway.com n.v

Christine Marie Perrette

Jane Doe (room 110)

Jane Doe (room 205A)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Frank A. Weiser

Attorney at Law Office of Frank A. Weiser

3460 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1212

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Adam C. Hackett

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart

19191 South Vermont Avenue, Suite 950

Torrance, CA 90502

 

Court Documents

#2

#4

#5

#6

#7

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Documents and Request for Judicial Notice by Alison Helen Fairchild. (dlg) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE in Non-Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(3), or in the alternative, to Transfer Case to Proper District; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; Declaration of Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(3), or in the alternative, to Transfer Case to Proper District filed by Evergreen Inn Motel, Mrs. Solanki, Sobi Investments, LLC, Nitin Bhanubhai Solanki. (Weiser, Frank) (dlg). (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Grubhub LLC re #12 Reply - Other in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Hackett, Adam) (dlg). (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY - Other re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and to Sua Sponte Sanction Plaintiff for Bad Faith Conduct filed by Grubhub LLC. (Hackett, Adam) (dlg). (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DECLARATION re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Declaration of Service by Defendant Grubhub LLC. (Hackett, Adam) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grubhub LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Hackett, Adam) (dlg). (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #8 MOTION to Dismiss: Responses due by 5/28/2021, Replies due by 6/4/2021. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/12/21.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Grubhub LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice Notice of Hearing, #2 Declaration Dec of A Hackett, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Dec, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Dec, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Dec, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Dec, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Dec, #8 Request for Judicial Notice Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Judicial Notice, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 2 -Judicial Notice, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 3 -Judicial Notice, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Judicial Notice)(Hackett, Adam)Attorney Adam C. Hackett added to party Grubhub LLC(pty:dft) (dlg). (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #6 MOTION to Dismiss : Responses due by 5/25/2021, Replies due by 6/4/2021. A hearing on this matter is set for June 18, 2021 at 1:30 P.M. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/6/21.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(3), or in the alternative, to Transfer Case to Proper District; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; Declaration of Frank A. Weiser by Evergreen Inn Motel, Mrs. Solanki, Sobi Investments, LLC, Nitin Bhanubhai Solanki. (Weiser, Frank)Attorney Frank A. Weiser added to party Evergreen Inn Motel(pty:dft), Attorney Frank A. Weiser added to party Mrs. Solanki(pty:dft), Attorney Frank A. Weiser added to party Sobi Investments, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Frank A. Weiser added to party Nitin Bhanubhai Solanki(pty:dft) (dlg). (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies. Mail sent to Alison Helen Fairchild. (bta) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Change of Address by Alison Helen Fairchild (jrm) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Application for Permission for Filing Electronically, from Plaintiff Alison Helen Fairchild. Non-compliance with local rule(s):Civ.L. Rule 7.1 or 47.1 - Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document; Civ.L. Rule 5.1 - Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation;, Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Rejected Document)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmr) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (fth) (dlg). (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Los Angeles County, Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department Sheriff Alex Villanueva, Sergeant White, Captain Andy Berg, Lieutenant Doe, Christine Marie Perrette, Nitin Bhanubhai Solanki, Mrs. Solanki, Sobi Investments, LLC, Evergreen Inn Motel, Michael Doe Defendant, Los Angeles County District Attorney's Office, Jane Doe (room 106), Jane Doe (room 110), John Doe (room 104), Jane Doe (room 205A), Grubhub LLC, Just Eat Takeaway.com n.v (doing business in the United States as Grubhub Inc), Does 1-10 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number CAS128415.), filed by Alison Helen Fairchild. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)The new case number is 3:21-cv-496-GPC-KSC. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Fairchild, Alison)(fth) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRUBHUB INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where : LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT TASKFORCE FOR REGIONAL AUTOTHEFT PREVENTION is a litigant

Latest cases where LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frank A Weiser