This case was last updated from PACER on 12/20/2020 at 08:49:01 (UTC).

Fair v. Kimball et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 Fair filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Kimball. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Julie S. Sneed. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-02454

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia M. Hernandez Covington

Referral Judge

Julie S. Sneed

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kimberly Fair

Defendants

John Weston Kimball

Sierra Financial, LLC

The Iipay Nation of Santa Ysabel

Globex Holdings, LLC

FactorTrust, Inc.

Blue Dart Ventures, LLC

Not Classified By Court

Peter J. Grilli

Tampa, FL 33609-3138

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas Martin Bonan

Attorney at Seraph Legal PA

2002 E 5Th Ave Ste 104

Tampa, FL 33605

Brandon David Morgan

Attorney at Seraph Legal, P.A.

2002 E 5Th Ave., Suite 104

Tampa, FL 33605

Defendant Attorneys

Dominic Anthony Isgro

Attorney at Sisco-Law

1110 N Florida Ave

Tampa, FL 33602

Zachary Foster

Attorney at Quarles & Brady, LLP

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 3400

Tampa, FL 33602-5195

Christian C. Burden

Attorney at Quarles & Brady, LLP

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 3400

Tampa, FL 33602-5195

Charlotte A. Long

Attorney at Quilling, Selander, Lownds, Winslett & Moser, P.C.

6900 N. Dallas Parkway, Suite 800

Plano, TX 75024

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Peter John Grilli

Attorney at Peter J. Grilli, PA

3001 W Azeele St

Tampa, FL 33609-3138

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) ENDORSED ORDER appointing Peter J. Grilli, Esq. as mediator in this action. The mediation conference is scheduled for April 2, 2021, at 10 AM. The Court directs that all counsel, parties, corporate representatives, and any other required claims professionals shall be present at the mediation conference with full authority to negotiate a settlement. The Court does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required. See Local Rule 9.05(c). Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/16/2020. (DMD) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#32

(#32) NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 4/2/2021 at 10:00 AM before Peter J. Grilli. (Morgan, Brandon) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#29

(#29) Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Extend Mediation Deadline and Schedule Mediation by Kimberly Fair. (Morgan, Brandon) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#28

(#28) NOTICE of settlement as to John Weston Kimball and Globex Holdings, LLC by Kimberly Fair. (Morgan, Brandon) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#27

(#27) NOTICE of change of address by Brandon David Morgan. (Morgan, Brandon) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#25

(#25) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Globex Holdings, LLC, John Weston Kimball. (Isgro, Dominic) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#23

(#24) ENDORSED ORDER: On the basis of the notice of settlement (Doc. #23), this cause is hereby dismissed as to Defendants Blue Dart Ventures, LLC, and Sierra Financial, LLC only, without prejudice and subject to the right of the parties, within 60 days of the date hereof, to submit a stipulated form of final order or judgment, or request an extension of time, should they so choose or for any party to move to reopen the action, upon good cause being shown. After that 60 day period, however, without further order, this dismissal shall be deemed with prejudice. The case remains open as to the claims against the other Defendants. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/1/2020. (DMD) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#4

(#4) RETURN of service executed on 10/26/20 by Kimberly Fair as to FactorTrust, Inc. (Morgan, Brandon) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Blue Dart Ventures, LLC, FactorTrust, Inc., Globex Holdings, LLC, John Weston Kimball, Sierra Financial, LLC, The Iipay Nation of Santa Ysabel. (CRH) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

1 #8

Proposed Summons

1 #7

Proposed Summons

1 #6

Proposed Summons

1 #5

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A to J

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17452929) filed by Kimberly Fair. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to J, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Morgan, Brandon) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ENDORSED ORDER appointing Peter J. Grilli, Esq. as mediator in this action. The mediation conference is scheduled for April 2, 2021, at 10 AM. The Court directs that all counsel, parties, corporate representatives, and any other required claims professionals shall be present at the mediation conference with full authority to negotiate a settlement. The Court does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required. See Local Rule 9.05(c). Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/16/2020. (DMD) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 4/2/2021 at 10:00 AM before Peter J. Grilli. (Morgan, Brandon) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ENDORSED ORDER: On the basis of the notice of settlement (Doc. #28), this cause is hereby dismissed as to Defendants John Weston Kimball and Globex Holdings, LLC, only, without prejudice and subject to the right of the parties, within 60 days of the date hereof, to submit a stipulated form of final order or judgment, or request an extension of time, should they so choose or for any party to move to reopen the action, upon good cause being shown. After that 60 day period, however, without further order, this dismissal shall be deemed with prejudice. Furthermore, the Court advises the parties that "good cause" exists to reopen an action when a settlement agreement has yet to be finalized because of various delays. But incomplete performance of an executed settlement agreement, such as the failure to disburse settlement funds, does not constitute good cause to reopen an action. This Court does not retain jurisdiction to ensure performance of a settlement agreement because such failure to perform should be addressed in a separate breach of contract action. The case remains open as to the claim against Defendant FactorTrust, Inc. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/16/2020. (DMD) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ENDORSED ORDER granting the unopposed motion to extend mediation deadline. (Doc. #29). The deadline to mediate in-person with Peter Grilli is now April 2, 2021. Notice of mediation due December 18, 2020. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/16/2020. (DMD) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Extend Mediation Deadline and Schedule Mediation by Kimberly Fair. (Morgan, Brandon) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE of settlement as to John Weston Kimball and Globex Holdings, LLC by Kimberly Fair. (Morgan, Brandon) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of change of address by Brandon David Morgan. (Morgan, Brandon) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendants John Weston Kimball and Globex Holdings, LLC's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint. (Doc. #25). Response now due January 4, 2021. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/1/2020. (DMD) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Globex Holdings, LLC, John Weston Kimball. (Isgro, Dominic) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ENDORSED ORDER: On the basis of the notice of settlement (Doc. #23), this cause is hereby dismissed as to Defendants Blue Dart Ventures, LLC, and Sierra Financial, LLC only, without prejudice and subject to the right of the parties, within 60 days of the date hereof, to submit a stipulated form of final order or judgment, or request an extension of time, should they so choose or for any party to move to reopen the action, upon good cause being shown. After that 60 day period, however, without further order, this dismissal shall be deemed with prejudice. The case remains open as to the claims against the other Defendants. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/1/2020. (DMD) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN of service executed on 10/29/20 by Kimberly Fair as to Sierra Financial, LLC. (Morgan, Brandon) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Kimberly Fair. (Morgan, Brandon) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kimberly Fair. Related case(s): no (Morgan, Brandon) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • Docket(#7) ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file a status report on her efforts to perfect service of process on Defendants John Weston Kimball, Globex Holdings, LLC, The Iipay Nation of Santa Ysabel, and Sierra Financial, LLC by November 16, 2020. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/9/2020. (DMD) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/29/2020. (TWL) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN of service executed on 10/26/20 by Kimberly Fair as to Blue Dart Ventures, LLC. (Morgan, Brandon) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN of service executed on 10/26/20 by Kimberly Fair as to FactorTrust, Inc. (Morgan, Brandon) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Blue Dart Ventures, LLC, FactorTrust, Inc., Globex Holdings, LLC, John Weston Kimball, Sierra Financial, LLC, The Iipay Nation of Santa Ysabel. (CRH) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:20-cv-2454-T-33JSS. (SJB) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17452929) filed by Kimberly Fair. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to J, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Morgan, Brandon) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sierra Financial LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Blue Dart Ventures LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FactorTrust, Inc. is a litigant