This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:22:51 (UTC).

FAIN v. INCH

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 FAIN filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against INCH. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and CHARLES A STAMPELOS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00586

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

CHARLES A STAMPELOS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MORRIS FAIN

Bristol, FL 32321

Respondent

MARK INCH

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) CLERK'S JUDGMENT re #6 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation. (90 Day Deadline set for 4/1/2020 to dispose working file). (MB) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge's #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The 2254 petition for writ of habeas corpus, ECF No. #1 , is DISMISSED. A certificate of appealability is DENIED and leave to appeal in forma pauperis is also DENIED. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/2/2020. (MB) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#5

(#5) OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations by MORRIS FAIN. (rcb) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

#4

(#4) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is therefore respectfully RECOMMENDED that the 2254 petition (ECF No. #1 ) be DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction as it is an unauthorized successive petition. It is further RECOMMENDED that a certificate of appealability be DENIED and that leave to appeal in forma pauperis be DENIED. - R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 12/10/2019. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 1/7/2020. (rcb) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice to Pro Se (rcb) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/9/2019) (rcb). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by MORRIS FAIN. (rcb)***No IFP Motion or Service Copies Received*** (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S JUDGMENT re #6 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation. (90 Day Deadline set for 4/1/2020 to dispose working file). (MB) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge's #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The 2254 petition for writ of habeas corpus, ECF No. #1 , is DISMISSED. A certificate of appealability is DENIED and leave to appeal in forma pauperis is also DENIED. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/2/2020. (MB) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by MORRIS FAIN - R&R flag set (rcb) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations by MORRIS FAIN. (rcb) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is therefore respectfully RECOMMENDED that the 2254 petition (ECF No. #1 ) be DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction as it is an unauthorized successive petition. It is further RECOMMENDED that a certificate of appealability be DENIED and that leave to appeal in forma pauperis be DENIED. - R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 12/10/2019. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 1/7/2020. (rcb) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by MORRIS FAIN. This document has been scanned as dark as possible for legibility. (kjw) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (rcb) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice to Pro Se (rcb) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/9/2019) (rcb). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by MORRIS FAIN. (rcb)***No IFP Motion or Service Copies Received*** (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.