This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/15/2021 at 10:52:23 (UTC).

Fails v. Schneider National Bulk Carriers Inc

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 Fails filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Schneider National Bulk Carriers Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John H England, III and Madeline Hughes Haikala. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00391

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

John H England, III

Madeline Hughes Haikala

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Princess M Fails

Defendant

Schneider National Bulk Carriers Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian Adam Traywick

Attorney at SHUNNARAH INJURY LAWYERS

2216 10Th Court South

Birmingham, AL 35222

Defendant Attorneys

Margaret Hammond Manuel

Attorney at CARR ALLISON

100 Vestavia Parkway

Birmingham, AL 35216

Brett A Ross

Attorney at CARR ALLISON PC

100 Vestavia Parkway

Birmingham, AL 35216

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

8 #1

Exhibit A

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER - The Court cannot determine from the face of the complaint that more than $75,000 is in controversy. (Doc. #1 -1, pp. 3-10). For these reasons, the Court may not exercise jurisdiction over this case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 4/22/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT - The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Madeline Hughes Haikala. Please use case number 2:21 CV 391 MHH on all subsequent pleadings. (AKD) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint MOTION to Remand by Schneider National Bulk Carriers Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ross, Brett) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John H England, III: Telephone Conference held on 4/15/2021; Attorney B. Traywick present by phone for the plaintiff; Attorney M. Manuel present by phone for the dft; consent process discussed; conf adj. (AVC) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 04/14/2021. (AKD) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER-The Initial Order entered on March 16, 2021, #5 was entered in error. Therefore, it is VACATED. The undersigned will reenter the initial order if the parties consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter the standard Order Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f) Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 04/14/2021. (AKD) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3799603 (ALND receipt# B4601112095). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Schneider National Bulk Carriers Inc from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2021-900603, filed by Schneider National Bulk Carriers Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (MEB2). (Ross, Brett) Modified on 3/18/2021 (AKD). (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) **VACATE**INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 03/16/2021. (AKD) Modified on 4/14/2021 Pursuant to order #6 (AKD). (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than April 30, 2021. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after April 30, 2021. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for April 15, 2021 at 10:45 a.m. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 03/16/2021. (AKD) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Schneider National Bulk Carriers Inc. (MEB2) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Schneider National Bulk Carriers Inc from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2021-900603, filed by Schneider National Bulk Carriers Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (MEB2) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Schneider National Bulk Carriers, Inc is a litigant