This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:53:35 (UTC).

Fahnbulleh et al v. U.S. Collections West Incorporated

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Fahnbulleh filed an Other lawsuit against U S Collections West Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan R Bolton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03232

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan R Bolton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jerrelle Copeland

George Fahnbulleh

Defendant

U.S. Collections West Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Adam Dessaules

Attorney at Dessaules Law Group

5353 N 16Th St., Ste. 110

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Douglas Clark Wigley

Attorney at Dessaules Law Group

5353 N 16Th St., Ste. 110

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Defendant Attorney

Alan Hart Zimmerman

Attorney at Alan H Zimmerman PC

1617 E Pinchot Ave.

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Exhibit 1-4

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Jerrelle Copeland, George Fahnbulleh. (Dessaules, Jonathan) (KAH) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#8

(#8) STATUS REPORT by Jerrelle Copeland, George Fahnbulleh. (Wigley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#6

(#6) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jerrelle Copeland, George Fahnbulleh: Certificate of Service re: Summons; Complaint and Exhibits 1-7; Civil Cover Sheet; General Order; MIDP Project Checklist; Notice of Availability of U.S. Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction; Notice to Parties MIDP upon U.S. Collections West, Inc. on 5/24/2019. (Wigley, Douglas) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16928805. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-03232-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAH) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to U.S. Collections West Incorporated. (KAH). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER that defendant file its answer no later than July 15, 2019 or default shall be entered. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' counsel send Defendant's counsel a copy of this Order immediately upon receipt. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/25/19. (CLB) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 5-7

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16928805 filed by George Fahnbulleh, Jerrelle Copeland. (Dessaules, Jonathan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-4, #3 Exhibit 5-7) (KAH) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Collections West Incorporated. (Zimmerman, Alan) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by U.S. Collections West Incorporated.(Zimmerman, Alan) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KAH) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER: After review of the docket, the Court notes that service on Defendant was made on May 24, 2019. No answer has been filed and no application for entry of default has been made. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for the Plaintiff file a status report within 7 days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the matter will be dismissed without further notice 7 days from the date of this Order if counsel fails to file a status report. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/17/19. (MAW) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Collections West Incorporated. (Zimmerman, Alan) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by U.S. Collections West Incorporated.(Zimmerman, Alan) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER that defendant file its answer no later than July 15, 2019 or default shall be entered. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' counsel send Defendant's counsel a copy of this Order immediately upon receipt. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/25/19. (CLB) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STATUS REPORT by Jerrelle Copeland, George Fahnbulleh. (Wigley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: After review of the docket, the Court notes that service on Defendant was made on May 24, 2019. No answer has been filed and no application for entry of default has been made. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for the Plaintiff file a status report within 7 days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the matter will be dismissed without further notice 7 days from the date of this Order if counsel fails to file a status report. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/17/19. (MAW) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jerrelle Copeland, George Fahnbulleh: Certificate of Service re: Summons; Complaint and Exhibits 1-7; Civil Cover Sheet; General Order; MIDP Project Checklist; Notice of Availability of U.S. Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction; Notice to Parties MIDP upon U.S. Collections West, Inc. on 5/24/2019. (Wigley, Douglas) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to U.S. Collections West Incorporated. (KAH). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KAH) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16928805. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-03232-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAH) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Jerrelle Copeland, George Fahnbulleh. (Dessaules, Jonathan) (KAH) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16928805 filed by George Fahnbulleh, Jerrelle Copeland. (Dessaules, Jonathan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-4, #3 Exhibit 5-7) (KAH) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.