This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2021 at 07:20:32 (UTC).

FAGINS v. EXPRESS SERVICES INC

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 FAGINS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against EXPRESS SERVICES INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are ALLEN C WINSOR and GARY R JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00034

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ALLEN C WINSOR

Referral Judge

GARY R JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Artis Fagins

Defendants

Gator Gypsum, Inc.

Express Services, Inc., d/b/a Express Employment Professionals

GATOR GYPSUM INC

EXPRESS SERVICES INC doing business as EXPRESS EMPLOYMENT PROFESSIONALS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARC REED EDELMAN

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN PA - TAMPA FL

201 N Franklin St, 7Th Fl

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

JENNIFER MONROSE MOORE

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH ETC PC - TAMPA FL

100 N Tampa St Ste 3600

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#16

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER STAYING CASE AND REQUIRING REPORT. (Deadline for clerk to check status of stay by 6/30/2021. Joint Status Report due by 7/9/2021). Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 4/14/2021. (kdm) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 4/14/2021. Parties discuss Joint Planning Report. Ruling by Court: Case is stayed through June mediation. Status report due by July 10. Another scheduling conference will be scheduled if necessary. An order will follow. (Court Reporter Julie Wycoff) (ckm) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Defendant's ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by EXPRESS SERVICES INC. (MOORE, JENNIFER) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/14/2021 at 10:30 AM before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. ALL PARTIES are directed to call the AT&T Conference Line (see below) Conference Call Information You may dial into the call up to five minutes before start time. Call in number: 877 873 8018 When prompted for an access code, enter: 6109198# If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 7020# Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. The Court also asks that counsel try NOT use cell phones or speaker phones during the call as the quality of the audioconnection is compromised by these devices. However, the Court also understands that under the current circumstances, a cell phone may be all that is available. Note: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodations, such as a hearing impairment that requires a sign-language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/TiAnn Stark Courtroom Deputy Clerk (tss) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re: #12 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed on 3/12/21 (bkp) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against EXPRESS SERVICES INC, filed by ARTIS FAGINS. (EDELMAN, MARC) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER STRIKING #11 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. (FIRST Amended Pleadings due by 4/12/2021). Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 3/12/2021. (kdm) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (EDELMAN, MARC) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ***STRICKEN PER #13 ORDER *** --- NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ARTIS FAGINS (EDELMAN, MARC) Modified on 3/12/2021 to add text (kdm). (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER ACKNOWLEDGING #9 DISMISSAL OF ACTION AGAINST GATOR GYPSUM INC. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 3/4/2021. This order confirms that the case has been dismissed against Gator Gypsum, Inc., only. Future filings should omit it from the case style. (kdm) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ARTIS FAGINS (EDELMAN, MARC) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by EXPRESS SERVICES INC. (MOORE, JENNIFER) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by EXPRESS SERVICES INC. (MOORE, JENNIFER) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 2/28/21. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 3/15/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/29/2021. Discovery due by 8/23/2021. Jury Trial set for 12/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Gainesville before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. (tss) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER GRANTING #4 MOTION FOR EXTENSION. (Answer due by 4/12/2021). Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 2/26/2021. (kdm) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Complaint by EXPRESS SERVICES INC. (MOORE, JENNIFER) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (kdm) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Filing Waiver of Service by Express Services, Inc., d/b/a Express Employment Professionals (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (MOORE, JENNIFER) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Express Services, Inc., d/b/a Express Employment Professionals from Eighth Judicial Circuit, Alachua County, Florida, case number 2020-CA-2924. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-5960943.), filed by Express Services, Inc., d/b/a Express Employment Professionals. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (MOORE, JENNIFER) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EXPRESS SERVICES INC. A COLORADO CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where GATOR GYPSUM, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc Reed Edelman