This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/12/2021 at 10:51:33 (UTC).

Fagen v. Landstar Ranger, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 Fagen filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Landstar Ranger, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael J. McShane. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01502

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael J. McShane

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cherri L. Fagen

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

Landstar Ranger, Inc.

Lloyd Eugene Theen

3Rd Party Defendant

Dann Reinhart

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David M. Rosen

Attorney at High Desert Law, LLC

990 Nw Brooks Street Suite 1

Bend, OR 97703

Nadia H. Dahab

Attorney at Sugerman Law Office

707 Sw Washington Streetste. 600

Portland, OR 97205

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian B. Williams

Attorney at Hitt Hiller Monfils Williams LLP

411 Sw Second Ave.Suite 400

Portland, OR 97204

Tomas Osborne

Attorney at Hitt Hiller Monfils Williams LLP

411 Sw 2Nd Aveste 400

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) Reply to Motion to Remand to State Court #8 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#15

(#15) Return of Service Executed as to Dann Reinhart served on 11/23/2021, answer due on 12/14/2021. (Williams, Brian) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#14

(#14) Declaration of Brian B. Williams . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Response to Motion #13 .) (Williams, Brian) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#13

(#13) Response to Motion to Remand to State Court #8 . Filed by All Defendants. (Williams, Brian) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#12

(#12) Second Notice re Notice of Removal, #1 , Notice #6 Filed by Landstar Ranger, Inc., Lloyd Eugene Theen. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 , Notice #6 .) (Williams, Brian) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#11

(#11) Summons Issued Electronically as to Dann Reinhart. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#10

(#10) Defendants' Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand , Third Party Complaint against Dann Reinhart . Filed by Lloyd Eugene Theen, Landstar Ranger, Inc.. (Williams, Brian) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#9

(#9) Proposed Summons Filed by All Defendants. (Williams, Brian) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#8

(#8) Motion to Remand to State Court. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#7

(#7) Declaration of Brian B. Williams . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice #6 .) (Williams, Brian) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#6

(#6) Amended Notice re Notice of Removal, #1 Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Williams, Brian) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance of Nadia H. Dahab appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs . Filed by Cherri L. Fagen. (Dahab, Nadia) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#4

(#4) Civil Cover Sheet regarding Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by All Defendants. (Williams, Brian) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Reply to Motion to Remand to State Court #8 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Return of Service Executed as to Dann Reinhart served on 11/23/2021, answer due on 12/14/2021. (Williams, Brian) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Declaration of Brian B. Williams . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Response to Motion #13 .) (Williams, Brian) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Response to Motion to Remand to State Court #8 . Filed by All Defendants. (Williams, Brian) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Second Notice re Notice of Removal, #1 , Notice #6 Filed by Landstar Ranger, Inc., Lloyd Eugene Theen. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 , Notice #6 .) (Williams, Brian) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Summons Issued Electronically as to Dann Reinhart. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Defendants' Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand , Third Party Complaint against Dann Reinhart . Filed by Lloyd Eugene Theen, Landstar Ranger, Inc.. (Williams, Brian) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposed Summons Filed by All Defendants. (Williams, Brian) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion to Remand to State Court. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Declaration of Brian B. Williams . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice #6 .) (Williams, Brian) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Amended Notice re Notice of Removal, #1 Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Williams, Brian) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance of Nadia H. Dahab appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs . Filed by Cherri L. Fagen. (Dahab, Nadia) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Civil Cover Sheet regarding Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by All Defendants. (Williams, Brian) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 2/10/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/14/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 3/14/2022. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (bd) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Declaration of Brian B. Williams in Support of Notice of Removal. (Related Doc. Notice of Removal #1 .) Filed by All Defendants. (Williams, Brian) Modified on 10/18/2021 to create document link and update docket text. NEF not regenerated to the parties. (bd) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 21cv34976 from Deschutes. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8267264 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Lloyd Eugene Theen, Landstar Ranger, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Williams, Brian) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LANDSTAR RANGER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tomas Osborne

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian B. Williams