Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/13/2021 at 11:59:36 (UTC).

Fagan v. Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Fagan filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard F. Boulware, II and Brenda Weksler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00616

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Camille Fagan

Defendants

LM Property & Casualty Insurance Company

LM Insurance Corporation

LM General Insurance

Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cassandra Cummings

Attorney at Eglet Adams

400 S. 7Th Street, Suite 400

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Matthew L. Sharp

Attorney at Matthew L. Sharp, Ltd.

432 Ridge St.

Reno, NV 89501

Robert T Eglet

Attorney at Eglet Prince

400 S. 7Th Street, Box 1, Suite 400

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Defendant Attorneys

Riley A. Clayton

Attorney at Hall Jaffe & Clayton, LLP

7425 Peak Drive

Las Vegas, NV 89128

Daniel M. Kavouras

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler - Cleveland

3200 Pnc Center, 1900 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Tiffany L. Powers

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

1201 West Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30309

Michael K Farrell

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler, LLP

127 Public Square, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) TRANSFER ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 2:21-cv-00616-APG-NJK is transferred to District Judge Richard F. Boulware, II, and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all documents shall be filed and shall bear the case number with District Judge Richard F. Boulware, II, and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler as assigned judges. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/20/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

18 #5

Exhibit D

18 #4

Exhibit C

18 #3

Exhibit B

18 #2

Exhibit A

18 #1

Index

#18

(#18) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants LM General Insurance, LM Insurance Corporation, LM Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. Responses due by 6/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Clayton, Riley) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

17 #6

Exhibit 6

17 #5

Exhibit 5

7 #3

Summons Affidavit of Service and Proof of Service of Summons LM General

7 #2

Summons Affidavit of Service and Proof of Service of Summons LM Ins Corp

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Camille Fagan. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Affidavit of Service and Proof of Service of Summons LM Property and Casualty, #2 Summons Affidavit of Service and Proof of Service of Summons LM Ins Corp, #3 Summons Affidavit of Service and Proof of Service of Summons LM General) (Eglet, Robert) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#6

(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Camille Fagan. (Sharp, Matthew) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/15/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/30/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#9) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond to Complaint and Adoption of Briefing Schedule re #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendants LM General Insurance, LM Insurance Corporation, LM Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. (Clayton, Riley) Modified on 4/22/2021 to link document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) (SLD). (Entered: 04/21/2021)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) TRANSFER ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 2:21-cv-00616-APG-NJK is transferred to District Judge Richard F. Boulware, II, and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all documents shall be filed and shall bear the case number with District Judge Richard F. Boulware, II, and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler as assigned judges. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/20/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants LM General Insurance, LM Insurance Corporation, LM Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. Responses due by 6/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Clayton, Riley) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY to #8 Notice of Related Cases by Plaintiff Camille Fagan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8) (Eglet, Robert) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE to #8 Notice of Related Cases by Defendants LM General Insurance, LM Insurance Corporation, LM Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Clayton, Riley) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants LM General Insurance, LM Insurance Corporation, LM Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Clayton, Riley) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER Granting #12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Michael K. Farrell and approving Designation of Local Counsel Riley A. Clayton. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/29/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER Granting #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Daniel M. Kavouras and approving Designation of Local Counsel Riley A. Clayton. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/29/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Michael K. Farrell and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Riley A. Clayton (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6467729) by Defendants LM General Insurance, LM Insurance Corporation, LM Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Clayton, Riley) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Daniel M. Kavouras and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Riley A. Clayton (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6467705) by Defendants LM General Insurance, LM Insurance Corporation, LM Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Clayton, Riley) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Motion to Dismiss due by 5/21/2021. Responses due by 6/21/2021. Replies due by 7/19/2021. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/22/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) Modified text on 4/23/2021 (SLD). (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond to Complaint and Adoption of Briefing Schedule re #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendants LM General Insurance, LM Insurance Corporation, LM Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. (Clayton, Riley) Modified on 4/22/2021 to link document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) (SLD). (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:21-cv-00400 & 2-21-cv-00440 & 2-21-cv-00487 & 2-21-cv-00571 & 2-21-cv-00574 & 2-21-cv-00598-JCM-EJY & 2-21-cv-00613 by Plaintiff Camille Fagan. (Eglet, Robert) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Camille Fagan. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Affidavit of Service and Proof of Service of Summons LM Property and Casualty, #2 Summons Affidavit of Service and Proof of Service of Summons LM Ins Corp, #3 Summons Affidavit of Service and Proof of Service of Summons LM General) (Eglet, Robert) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Camille Fagan. (Sharp, Matthew) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Michael K Farrell, Tiffany L. Powers to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 4/29/2021. (no image attached) (JQC) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/15/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/30/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Michael K. Farrell and Tiffany L. Powers to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 4/29/2021. (no image attached) (SLD) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-892203-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6447950) by LM Insurance Corporation, LM General Insurance, LM Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Clayton, Riley) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LM PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LM Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where LM General Insurance Company is a litigant