This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:19:44 (UTC).

Facer vs A.R.M. Solutions, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Facer filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against A R M Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Russell G. Vineyard and Timothy C. Batten, Sr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00174

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Russell G. Vineyard

Presiding Judge

Timothy C. Batten, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Iver Facer, III

Defendant

A.RM. Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Thomas Berry

Attorney at Berry & Associates, P.C.

Suite 600, 2751 Buford Highway

Atlanta, GA 30324

Joseph Lewis Erkenbrack

Attorney at Berry & Associates

2751 Buford Highway Ne, Ste 600

Atlanta, GA 30324

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Iver Facer, III. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9152829) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(dmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit 1

#3

(#3) ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to administratively close the case. The parties shall file a dismissal upon finalization of the settlement documents. If settlement negotiations fail, the parties should promptlymove to reopen the case. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 12/30/2019. (adg) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Settlement A.R.M. Solution, Inc. by Iver Facer, III (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 12/28/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard terminated from case. (adg) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to administratively close the case. The parties shall file a dismissal upon finalization of the settlement documents. If settlement negotiations fail, the parties should promptlymove to reopen the case. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 12/30/2019. (adg) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Settlement A.R.M. Solution, Inc. by Iver Facer, III (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 12/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Iver Facer, III. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9152829) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(dmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.