This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2020 at 11:05:51 (UTC).

Facebook, Inc. v. Sluchevsky et al

Case Summary

On 03/08/2019 Facebook, Inc filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Sluchevsky. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Scott Corley and Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-01277

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jacqueline Scott Corley

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Facebook, Inc.

Defendants

Andrey Gorbachov

Gleb Sluchevsky

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Jefferson Steele

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

515 South Flower Street, 42Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2223

Steven Erick Lauridsen

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

515 South Flower Street, Forty Second Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Howard Alan Kroll

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

515 South Flower Street, Forty-Second Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2223

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) ORDER ADOPTING IN PART MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #25 Motion for Default Judgment - by the Court, filed by Facebook, Inc., #31 Report and Recommendations, ORDER granting plaintiff's motion for default judgment; granting plaintiff's request for a permanent injunction. Plaintiff shall be entitled to $65,857 in attorneys fees and $8,989.95 in costs. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/30/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

32 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#32

(#32) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 08/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#31

(#31) ORDER REASSIGNING AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT #25 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/28/2020. Objections due by 9/11/2020.(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#29

(#29) ORDER RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND REQUEST FOR FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/11/2020. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2020) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

25 #3

Declaration of Steven E. Lauridsen

25 #2

Declaration of Meghan Wleklinski

25 #1

Proposed Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction

#25

(#25) MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to All Claims Against All Defendants filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 7/23/2020. Replies due by 7/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction, #2 Declaration of Meghan Wleklinski, #3 Declaration of Steven E. Lauridsen)(Steele, David) (Filed on 7/9/2020) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/8/2019) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

#3

(#3) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Facebook, Inc. (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/8/2019) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc. (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/8/2019) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrey Gorbachov, Gleb Sluchevsky ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13156448.). Filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steele, David) (Filed on 3/8/2019) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER ADOPTING IN PART MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #25 Motion for Default Judgment - by the Court, filed by Facebook, Inc., #31 Report and Recommendations, ORDER granting plaintiff's motion for default judgment; granting plaintiff's request for a permanent injunction. Plaintiff shall be entitled to $65,857 in attorneys fees and $8,989.95 in costs. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/30/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 08/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER REASSIGNING AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT #25 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/28/2020. Objections due by 9/11/2020.(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) RESPONSE re #29 Order via Memorandum in Support of Request for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David J. Steele)(Steele, David) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND REQUEST FOR FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/11/2020. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2020) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • Docket(#28) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. The motion hearing at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1613661817?pwd=Z0tnSzBvKzJMN25SRFB3M1B6dFBadz09Meeting ID: 161 366 1817Password: 924619Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscou rts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2020) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #26 Motion to Continue. Further Case Management Conference reset for 10/22/2020 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020) (Entered: 07/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Sixth MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Steven E. Lauridsen)(Steele, David) (Filed on 7/9/2020) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to All Claims Against All Defendants filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 7/23/2020. Replies due by 7/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction, #2 Declaration of Meghan Wleklinski, #3 Declaration of Steven E. Lauridsen)(Steele, David) (Filed on 7/9/2020) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #23 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference reset for 7/23/2020 at 1:30 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2020) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Facebook, Inc... (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/12/2019) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to Andrey Gorbachov. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Gleb Sluchevsky. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/30/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • (#6) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/22/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proposed Summons. (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/8/2019) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Summons. (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/8/2019) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Facebook, Inc. (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/8/2019) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc. (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/8/2019) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Andrey Gorbachov, Gleb Sluchevsky ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13156448.). Filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steele, David) (Filed on 3/8/2019) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less