This case was last updated from PACER on 11/11/2019 at 08:21:04 (UTC).

Fabrique Innovations, Inc. v. A.P. Express, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 Fabrique Innovations, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against A P Express, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gail J. Standish and Michael W. Fitzgerald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-07904

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gail J. Standish

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Fabrique Innovations, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

A.P. Express, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Peter M Cho

Attorney at Peter Cho Law Offices

P O Box 3585

Palos Verdes Peninsula, CA 90274

David K Bowles

Attorney at Law Offices of David Bowles PLLC

14 Wall Street 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Corey Hayden Collins

Attorney at Rutan and Tucker LLP

611 Anton Boulevard 14Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-1931

Lisa N Neal

Attorney at Rutan and Tucker LLP

611 Anton Boulevard Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-1931

Mary Christine Brady

Attorney at Rutan and Tucker LLP

611 Anton Boulevard 14Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #19 filed by Defendant Fabrique Innovations, Inc..(Bowles, David) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#25

(#25) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE #16 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The OSC is discharged and the request for a preliminary injunction is DENIED. (iv) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

19 #5

Exhibit E

19 #4

Exhibit D

19 #3

Exhibit C

19 #2

Exhibit B

19 #1

Exhibit A

#19

(#19) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Fabrique Innovations, Inc. filed by Defendant and Counter-Plaintiff A.P. Express, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Attorney Lisa N Neal added to party A.P. Express, LLC(pty:dft))(Neal, Lisa) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#16

(#17) RESPONSE filed by Defendant A.P. Express, LLCto Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,, #16 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew J. Cass in Support of Response, #2 Declaration of Lisa N. Neal in Support of Response, #3 Objections to First Declaration of Michael Springer, #4 Objections to Second Declaration of Michael Springer, #5 Objections to Declaration of Sy Garfinkel, #6 Objections to Declaration of Robert Zurlnick, #7 Proposed Order)(Neal, Lisa) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

4 #5

Exhibit E - Email

4 #4

Exhibit D - Email

4 #3

Exhibit C - Emails

3 #3

Memorandum

3 #2

Declaration

3 #1

Declaration

#3

(#10) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #3 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Plaintiff's Application is DENIED without prejudice. (iv) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Fabrique Innovations, Inc.. (Bowles, David) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#1

(#19) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Fabrique Innovations, Inc. filed by Defendant and Counter-Plaintiff A.P. Express, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Attorney Lisa N Neal added to party A.P. Express, LLC(pty:dft))(Neal, Lisa) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

102 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #19 filed by Defendant Fabrique Innovations, Inc..(Bowles, David) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE #16 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The OSC is discharged and the request for a preliminary injunction is DENIED. (iv) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MINUTES OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PRELIMINIARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case called, and counsel make their appearance. The Court invites counsel to present their oral arguments. Arguments by counsel are heard. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (iv) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Fabrique Innovations, Inc., upon Defendant A.P. Express, LLC served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Melissa Blocker, Receptionist / Authorized to receive service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bowles, David) (Entered: 10/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference on 01/13/2020 at 11:00 AM. (pg) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: On the Court's own motion, the Order to Show Cause Hearing #16 set for 10/15/2019 is ADVANCED to 9:00 a.m. before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant and Counter-Plaintiff A.P. Express, LLC, identifying CIT Group/Commercial Services, inc.; Jeffrey Pont; and Matthew Cass. (Neal, Lisa) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Fabrique Innovations, Inc. filed by Defendant and Counter-Plaintiff A.P. Express, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Attorney Lisa N Neal added to party A.P. Express, LLC(pty:dft))(Neal, Lisa) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) REPLY Support Third APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Shipment of goods Third APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction re Shipment of goods . Motion #15 filed by Plaintiff Fabrique Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Malhotra Reply Dec, #2 Exhibit Ex K to Malhotra Reply Dec, #3 Exhibit Ex L to Malhotra Reply Dec, #4 Exhibit Ex M to Malhotra Reply Dec, #5 Exhibit Ex N to Malhotra Reply Dec, #6 Exhibit Ex O to Malhotra Reply Dec, #7 Exhibit Ex P to Malhotra Reply Dec, #8 Exhibit Ex Q to Malhotra Reply Dec, #9 Exhibit Ex R to Malhotra Reply Dec, #10 Exhibit Ex S to Malhotra Reply Dec, #11 Exhibit Ex T to Malhotra Reply Dec, #12 Exhibit Ex U to Malhotra Reply Dec, #13 Exhibit Ex V to Malhotra Reply Dec, #14 Exhibit Ex W to Malhotra Reply Dec, #15 Declaration Zurlnick Reply Dec, #16 Exhibit Ex X to Zurlnick Reply Dec, #17 Exhibit Ex AA to Zurlnick Reply Dec, #18 Declaration Bowles Reply Dec, #19 Exhibit Ex Y to Bowles Reply Dec, #20 Exhibit Ex Z to Bowles Reply Dec, #21 Declaration Springer Reply Dec, #22 Exhibit Ex AB to Springer Reply Dec, #23 Declaration Garfinkel Reply Dec, #24 Proposed Order, #25 Response to objections - Springer 1st, #26 Response to objections - Springer 2nd, #27 Response to objections - Garfinkel, #28 Response to objections - Zurlnick)(Bowles, David) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) RESPONSE filed by Defendant A.P. Express, LLCto Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,, #16 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew J. Cass in Support of Response, #2 Declaration of Lisa N. Neal in Support of Response, #3 Objections to First Declaration of Michael Springer, #4 Objections to Second Declaration of Michael Springer, #5 Objections to Declaration of Sy Garfinkel, #6 Objections to Declaration of Robert Zurlnick, #7 Proposed Order)(Neal, Lisa) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #3 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Plaintiff's Application is DENIED without prejudice. (iv) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Fabrique Innovations, Inc., identifying Sy Garfinkel. (Bowles, David) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07904 MWF(GJSx). (rn) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) EXHIBIT A - G to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Continue shipping goods EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction re Continue shipping goods . Motion #3 filed by Plaintiff Fabrique Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Emails, #3 Exhibit C - Emails, #4 Exhibit D - Email, #5 Exhibit E - Email, #6 Exhibit F - Invoices, #7 Exhibit G - Email)(Bowles, David) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Continue shipping goods , EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction re Continue shipping goods . Motion filed by Plaintiff Fabrique Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Memorandum) (Bowles, David) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Fabrique Innovations, Inc.. (Bowles, David) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24428281 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Fabrique Innovations, Inc.. (Attorney David K Bowles added to party Fabrique Innovations, Inc.(pty:pla))(Bowles, David) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fabrique Innovations, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where A.P. EXPRESS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant