Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/31/2019 at 07:01:10 (UTC).

Fabrikant v. Assured Auto Group, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2019 Fabrikant filed an Other lawsuit against Assured Auto Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan M. Bazis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00383

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nebraska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan M. Bazis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ben Fabrikant

Defendants

Northcoast Warranty Services, Inc.

Sunpath Limited Corp.

Assured Auto Group, Inc.

Wesco Insurance Company

John Doe 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark L. Javitch

Attorney at MARK JAVITCH

210 South Ellsworth Avenue, Suite 486

San Mateo, CA 94010

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Assured Auto Group, Inc. on 10/8/2019. (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#15

(#15) Amended Summons Issued as to defendant Assured Auto Group, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (CS) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#14

(#14) Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#13

(#13) Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant Assured Auto Group, Inc.. (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Wesco Insurance Company on 9/13/2019. (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 09/21/2019)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Sunpath Limited Corp. on 9/13/2019. (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 09/21/2019)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Northcoast Warranty Services, Inc. on 9/13/2019. (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 09/21/2019)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to defendants Assured Auto Group, Inc., Northcoast Warranty Services, Inc., Sunpath Limited Corp., and Wesco Insurance Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (KLF) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#8

(#8) Summons Requested as to Wesco Insurance Company regarding Complaint #1 . (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#7

(#7) Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#6

(#6) Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4009493 by Attorney Mark L. Javitch on behalf of Plaintiff Ben Fabrikant.(Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 09/01/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4009491), by Attorney Mark L. Javitch on behalf of Ben Fabrikant (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 09/01/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Assured Auto Group, Inc. on 10/8/2019. (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Amended Summons Issued as to defendant Assured Auto Group, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (CS) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant Assured Auto Group, Inc.. (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Wesco Insurance Company on 9/13/2019. (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 09/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Sunpath Limited Corp. on 9/13/2019. (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 09/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Northcoast Warranty Services, Inc. on 9/13/2019. (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 09/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to defendants Assured Auto Group, Inc., Northcoast Warranty Services, Inc., Sunpath Limited Corp., and Wesco Insurance Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (KLF) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Requested as to Wesco Insurance Company regarding Complaint #1 . (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #2 for attorney Mark Javitch. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • (#3) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (KLF) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4009493 by Attorney Mark L. Javitch on behalf of Plaintiff Ben Fabrikant.(Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 09/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4009491), by Attorney Mark L. Javitch on behalf of Ben Fabrikant (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 09/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark L. Javitch