This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/02/2021 at 06:52:27 (UTC).

Terry Fabricant v. Wavve Marketing Corp et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 Terry Fabricant filed an Other lawsuit against Wavve Marketing Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip S. Gutierrez and Steve Kim. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01619

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip S. Gutierrez

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terry Fabricant

Defendants

WAVVE MARKETING CORP

The Federal Savings Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William A Percy

Attorney at Schlichter and Schonack LLP

2381 Rosecrans Avenue Suite 326

El Segundo, CA 90245

Anthony I Paronich

Attorney at Paronich Law PC

350 Lincoln Street Suite 2400

Hingham, MA 02043

Anthony I. Paronich

Attorney at Paronich Law PC

350 Lincoln Street Suite 2400

Hingham, MA 02043

Defendant Attorneys

David J. Kaminski

Attorney at Carlson and Messer LLP

5901 West Century Boulevard Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Stephen A. Watkins

Attorney at Carlson and Messer LLP

5901 West Century Boulevard Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Jennifer N Lutz

Attorney at Pettit Kohn Ingrassia Lutz and Dolin PC

5901 West Century Boulevard Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Jennifer N. Lutz

Attorney at Pettit Kohn Ingrassia Lutz and Dolin PC

11622 El Camino Real, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130

Ari Karen

Attorney at Offit Kurman PA

4800 Montgomery Lane 8Th Floor

Bethesda, MD 20814

John J. Allegretto

Attorney at Offit Kurman PA

Ten Penn Center, 1801 Market Street Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#49

(#49) ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #48 Non-Resident Attorney John J. Allegretto APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of The Federal Savings Bank, designating Jennifer N. Lutz as local counsel. (yl) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#47

(#47) ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Granting #45 Non-Resident Attorney Karen Ari APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Federal Savings Bank, designating Jennifer N. Lutz as local counsel. (et) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

#44

(#44) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) The Court GRANTS the motion to stay by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Defendants motion to stay. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report within 14 days after the decision in Duguid is issued. If no decision has been issued by July 1, 2021, the parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report informing the Court of such. IT IS SO ORDERED. #43 (See minutes for further details) (yl) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#43

(#43) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) The Court GRANTS the motion to stay #26 . by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Defendants motion to stay. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report within 14 days after the decision in Duguid is issued. If no decision has been issued by July 1, 2021, the parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report informing the Court of such. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See minutes for further details) (yl) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#36

(#41) ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ari Karen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Federal Savings Bank #39 , #36 for the following reasons:Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) re certificate of good standing not filed within 30 days (yl) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant The Federal Savings Bank. (bm) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#8

(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Terry Fabricant. (Percy, William) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#7

(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Terry Fabricant. (Percy, William) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Terry Fabricant, (Percy, William) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Terry Fabricant. (Percy, William) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#1

(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Wavve Marketing Corp. (bm) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #48 Non-Resident Attorney John J. Allegretto APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of The Federal Savings Bank, designating Jennifer N. Lutz as local counsel. (yl) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John J. Allegretto to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Federal Savings Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 9/28/2020, Receipt No. 28278002) filed by Defendant The Federal Savings Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lutz, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Granting #45 Non-Resident Attorney Karen Ari APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Federal Savings Bank, designating Jennifer N. Lutz as local counsel. (et) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ari Karen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Federal Savings Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 9/28/2020, Receipt No. 28278565) filed by Defendant The Federal Savings Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lutz, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) The Court GRANTS the motion to stay by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Defendants motion to stay. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report within 14 days after the decision in Duguid is issued. If no decision has been issued by July 1, 2021, the parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report informing the Court of such. IT IS SO ORDERED. #43 (See minutes for further details) (yl) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) The Court GRANTS the motion to stay #26 . by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Defendants motion to stay. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report within 14 days after the decision in Duguid is issued. If no decision has been issued by July 1, 2021, the parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report informing the Court of such. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See minutes for further details) (yl) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) REPLY Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case #26 filed by Defendant Wavve Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen A. Watkins in Support of Reply in Support of Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit A)(Kaminski, David) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ari Karen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Federal Savings Bank #39 , #36 for the following reasons:Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) re certificate of good standing not filed within 30 days (yl) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #45 Non-Resident Attorney Karen, Ari APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of The Federal Savings Bank, designating Lutz, Jennifer N. as local counsel. (yl) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ari Karen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Federal Savings Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28278565) #39 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John J. Allegretto to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Federal Savings Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28278002) #38 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Wavve Marketing Corp. (bm) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant The Federal Savings Bank. (bm) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Terry Fabricant. (Percy, William) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Terry Fabricant. (Percy, William) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Terry Fabricant, (Percy, William) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Terry Fabricant. (Percy, William) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25404075 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Terry Fabricant. (Attorney William A Percy added to party Terry Fabricant(pty:pla))(Percy, William) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHN J. ALLEGRETTO

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ari Karen Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer N Lutz