This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/20/2021 at 08:30:27 (UTC).

Fabric Selection, Inc. v. BJ21 Textile, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 Fabric Selection, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against BJ21 Textile, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Dean D. Pregerson and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00515

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dean D. Pregerson

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fabric Selection, Inc.

Defendants

Does 1 through 10

Shoptiques, Inc.

BJ21 Textile, Inc. a California corporation, individually and doing business as THML Clothing

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott A Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Scott A. Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Trevor William Barrett

Attorney at Doninger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Stephen M. Doniger

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Justin M Gomes

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Defendant Attorney

Jeff A Mann

Attorney at Jeff Mann Law Offices

3600 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1428

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Fabric Selection, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Shoptiques, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Scheduling Conference set for April 5, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. This matter is set for a scheduling conference in Courtroom 9C, before the Honorable Dean D. Pregerson, located at 350 West 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. The conferencewill be held pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16(b). Lead trial counsel shall attend the scheduling conference. See order for further details. (shb) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address ishttp://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. See order for further details. (shb) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant, BJ21 Textile, Inc. BJ21 Textile, Inc., (Mann, Jeff) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Answer filed by Defendant, BJ21 Textile, Inc. BJ21 Textile, Inc..(Attorney Jeff A Mann added to party BJ21 Textile, Inc.(pty:dft))(Mann, Jeff) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Fabric Selection, Inc., upon Defendant BJ21 Textile, Inc. served on 2/10/2021, answer due 3/3/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Billy Bonghoon Han - Registered Agent for Service of Process c/o Daniel Paik - Manager, Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants BJ21 Textile, Inc., Shoptiques, Inc. (et) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (et) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Fabric Selection, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Fabric Selection, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Fabric Selection, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Fabric Selection, Inc., (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30123043 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Fabric Selection, Inc.. (Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Fabric Selection, Inc.(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Shoptiques, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where FABRIC SELECTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeff A Mann