This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:26:30 (UTC).

F. v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 F filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Juul Labs, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00113

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

G. F.

Defendants

JUUL Labs Inc

Pax Labs Inc

Phillip Morris USA, Inc.

Altria Group Inc.

Juul Labs Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Curt D. Marshall

Attorney at Weitz & Luxenberg, P.C.

700 Broadway

New York, NY 10003

Ellen Relkin

Attorney at Weitz & Luxenberg

220 Lake Drive East, Suite 210

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Related Case by G. F. (Marshall, Curt) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#6

RESTRICTED

9 #2

Certificate/Proof of Service

9 #3

Certificate/Proof of Service

#8

(#8) Case transferred in from District of Connecticut; Case Number 3:19-cv-01980. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/06/2020)

8 #1

*Restricted*

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5595826.), filed by G.F.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marshall, Curt) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to District of Northern California. Signed by Clerk on 1/2/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Altria Group, Inc., Does, Juul Labs, Inc., PAX Labs, Inc., Phillip Morris USA, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Curt D. Marshall* *Weitz & Luxenberg, P.C.* *700 Broadway* *New York, NY 10003*. (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

9 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by G. F. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Relkin, Ellen) (Filed on 2/3/2020) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by G. F., #4 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice of Related Case filed by G. F., #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 12/19/19.(Pesta, J.) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 12/17/19.(Pesta, J.) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#3

(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/15/2020 Discovery due by 6/17/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 7/22/2020 Signed by Clerk on 12/17/19.(Pesta, J.) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Transcript of Proceedings held on February 14, 2020, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (376 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order, (375 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order, (371 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order, (374 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order, (373 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2020. (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by G. F. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Relkin, Ellen) (Filed on 2/3/2020) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketMEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2913: District of Connecticut, 19-01980, G.F. v. Juul Labs Inc., Opened in California Northern District as 20-00113 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 18 cc: JPMDL. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case transferred in from District of Connecticut; Case Number 3:19-cv-01980. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to District of Northern California. Signed by Clerk on 1/2/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Altria Group, Inc., Does, Juul Labs, Inc., PAX Labs, Inc., Phillip Morris USA, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Curt D. Marshall* *Weitz & Luxenberg, P.C.* *700 Broadway* *New York, NY 10003*. (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by G. F., #4 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice of Related Case filed by G. F., #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 12/19/19.(Pesta, J.) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Related Case by G. F. (Marshall, Curt) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • Request for Clerk to issue summons as to G. F.. (Marshall, Curt) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 12/17/19.(Pesta, J.) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/15/2020 Discovery due by 6/17/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 7/22/2020 Signed by Clerk on 12/17/19.(Pesta, J.) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr added. (Walker, J.) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5595826.), filed by G.F.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marshall, Curt) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less