This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 05:49:56 (UTC).

EYNON v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 EYNON filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lois H. Goodman and Freda L. Wolfson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-21057

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATRICIA EYNON

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. ( F/K/A JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC.)

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL ALLEN AKSELRUD

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

21550 Oxnard Street, 3Rd Floor

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant Attorneys

SUSAN M. SHARKO

Attorney at DRINKER, BIDDLE & REATH, LLP

600 Campus Drive

Florham Park, NJ 07932-1047

SCOTT A. JAMES

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Street, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2926

KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Ste 3400

Houston, TX 77002

JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN

Attorney at Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

600 Campus Drive

Florham Park, NJ 07932

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. ( F/K/A JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC.) (BRENNAN, JESSICA) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. ( F/K/A JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC.) (SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. ( F/K/A JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC.) (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. ( F/K/A JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC.) (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. ( F/K/A JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC.). Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (pth) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. ( F/K/A JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC.) ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10157195) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PATRICIA EYNON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(AKSELRUD, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. ( F/K/A JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC.) (BRENNAN, JESSICA) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. ( F/K/A JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC.) (SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. ( F/K/A JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC.) (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. ( F/K/A JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC.) (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketMember Case Direct File on 12/4/19, for MDL 16-2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (pth) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. ( F/K/A JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC.). Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (pth) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. ( F/K/A JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC.) ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10157195) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PATRICIA EYNON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(AKSELRUD, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less