This case was last updated from PACER on 09/24/2021 at 07:57:28 (UTC).

ExxonMobil Oil Corporation v. PBF Holding Company LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 ExxonMobil Oil Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PBF Holding Company LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frederic Block and Lois Bloom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04183

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frederic Block

Referral Judge

Lois Bloom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ExxonMobil Oil Corporation

Defendants

PBF Holding Company LLC

Paulsboro Terminaling Company LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John B. McCusker

Attorney at McCusker, Anselmi, Rosen, Carvelli

805 Third Avenue, 12Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Defendant Attorney

Brian Graffeo

Attorney at Williams Graffeo & Stern LLC

60 Washington St, Suite 204

Morristown, NJ 07960

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Protective Order. See attached Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 9/17/2021. (Van Buren, Ethan) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Stipulated Order Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. See attached Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 9/17/2021. (Van Buren, Ethan) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#10

(#10) Proposed MOTION for Discovery Stipulation Order Regarding Discovery of ESI by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (McCusker, John) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#9

(#9) Proposed MOTION for Protective Order by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (McCusker, John) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#8

(#8) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (McCusker, John) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#7

(#7) Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by All Defendants. (Graffeo, Brian) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. Paulsboro Terminaling Company LLC served on 8/5/2021, answer due 8/26/2021. (McCusker, John) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. PBF Holding Company LLC served on 8/5/2021, answer due 8/26/2021. (McCusker, John) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

4 #1

Summons

4 #4

Main Document

1 #7

Proposed Summons Summons to Paulsboro Terminaling Company LLC

1 #6

Proposed Summons Summons to PBF Holding Company LLC

1 #5

ExxonMobil Oil Corporation Corporate Disclosure

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint ExxonMobil Oil Corporation v PBF Holding Company

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint ExxonMobil Oil Corporation v PBF Holding Company

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint ExxonMobil Oil Corporation v PBF Holding Company

1 #1

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketORDER: The Court held the initial conference in plaintiff's breach of contract case on September 22, 2021. Any request to amend the pleadings or to add parties shall be made by October 15, 2021. Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(3). The Court defers setting other discovery deadlines at this time. The Court shall hold another telephone status conference on October 19, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. The parties shall call the Chambers telephone conference line at (888) 363-4734 and use the access code 4444221 promptly at 11:30 a.m. The parties are reminded that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least seventy-two (72) hours before the scheduled conference. The parties shall meet and confer by October 12, 2021 regarding early settlement and shall file a joint status letter by October 15, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 9/22/2021. (Van Buren, Ethan) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/22/2021 (AT&T Log #10:37-10:59.) (Van Buren, Ethan) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Protective Order. See attached Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 9/17/2021. (Van Buren, Ethan) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Stipulated Order Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. See attached Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 9/17/2021. (Van Buren, Ethan) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Proposed MOTION for Discovery Stipulation Order Regarding Discovery of ESI by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (McCusker, John) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposed MOTION for Protective Order by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (McCusker, John) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (McCusker, John) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketORDER: The Court shall hold the initial conference by telephone in plaintiff's breach of contract case on September 22, 2021 at 10:30a.m. The parties shall call the Chambers telephone conference line at (888) 363-4734 and use the access code 4444221 promptly at 10:30a.m. The parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and file their Rule 26(f) Meeting Report with the Court by September 15, 2021. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least seventy-two (72) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 8/19/2021. (Wilhelm, Samantha) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by All Defendants. (Graffeo, Brian) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. Paulsboro Terminaling Company LLC served on 8/5/2021, answer due 8/26/2021. (McCusker, John) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. PBF Holding Company LLC served on 8/5/2021, answer due 8/26/2021. (McCusker, John) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to PBF Holding Company LLC, Paulsboro Terminaling Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14692305 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint ExxonMobil Oil Corporation v PBF Holding Company et al, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint ExxonMobil Oil Corporation v PBF Holding Company et al, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint ExxonMobil Oil Corporation v PBF Holding Company et al, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 ExxonMobil Oil Corporation Corporate Disclosure, #6 Proposed Summons Summons to PBF Holding Company LLC, #7 Proposed Summons Summons to Paulsboro Terminaling Company LLC) (McCusker, John) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PBF Holding Company LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ExxonMobil Oil Corporation is a litigant