This case was last updated from PACER on 08/31/2021 at 05:53:55 (UTC).

Express Mobile, Inc. v. eBay Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 Express Mobile, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against eBay Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-06656

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Express Mobile, Inc.

Defendant

EBay Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles L. Ainsworth

Attorney at Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, P.C.

100 East Ferguson, Suite 418

Tyler, TX 75702

Jerry D. Tice, II

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich & Belloli LLP

577 Airport Boulevard, Suite 250

Burlingame, CA 94010

Ryan Dooley

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich & Belloli LLP

577 Airport Blvd., Suite 250

Burlingame, CA 94010

Scott W. Hejny

Attorney at McKool Smith, P.C.

300 Crescent Court, Suite 1500, Suite 3400

Dallas, TX 75201

Sven Raz

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich & Belloli LLP

577 Airport Blvd., Suite 250

Burlingame, CA 94010

David Alberti

Attorney at Piper, Rudnick,

2000 University Avenue

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

Marc Belloli

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich & Belloli

577 Airport Blvd., Suite 250

Burlingame, CA 94010

Margaret Elizabeth Day

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich & Belloli

577 Airport Blvd., Suite 250

Burlingame, CA 94010

Robert F. Kramer

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich & Belloli LLP

577 Airport Blvd., Suite 250

Burlingame, CA 94010

Russell S. Tonkovich

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti LimTonkovich & Belloli

557 Airport Blvd, Suite 250

Burlingame, CA 94010

Sal Lim

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich & Belloli LLP

577 Airport Boulevard, Suite 250

Burlingame, CA 94010

Robert Christopher Bunt

Attorney at Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, P.C.

100 East Ferguson, Ste. 1114

Tyler, TX 75702

Defendant Attorneys

Jared Bobrow

Attorney at Orrick, Herringotn & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Kristina DiBenedetto McKenna

Attorney at Orrick Herrington Sutcliffe LLP

222 Berkeley St, Ste. 2000

Boston, MA 02116

Shane D. Anderson

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP

777 South Figueroa Street, Suite 3200

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Will H. Melehani

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

405 Howard St.

San Francisco, CA 94105

Will Hussein Melehani

Attorney at Orrick Herrington and Sutcliffe

2050 Main St Suite 1100

Irvine, CA 92692

 

Court Documents

#67

(#67) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by EBay Inc (Melehani, Will) (Filed on 8/30/2021) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#66

(#66) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Express Mobile, Inc. (Kramer, Robert) (Filed on 8/30/2021) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#65

(#65) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Express Mobile, Inc... (Kramer, Robert) (Filed on 8/30/2021) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#64

(#64) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2021 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

63 #1

*Restricted*

#63

(#63) Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:20-cv-00802. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#62

RESTRICTED

25 #1

Affidavit W. Melehani

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Bunt, Robert) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/1/2020) (am). (Entered: 09/01/2020)

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13918776). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Bunt, Robert) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/1/2020) (am). (Entered: 09/01/2020)

280 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by EBay Inc (Melehani, Will) (Filed on 8/30/2021) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Express Mobile, Inc. (Kramer, Robert) (Filed on 8/30/2021) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Express Mobile, Inc... (Kramer, Robert) (Filed on 8/30/2021) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2021 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:20-cv-00802. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) Sealed Order Granting #44 eBays Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCase Stayed (lad) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #25 Motion to Stay entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion to Stay. The Court GRANTS the Motion. This case is HEREBY STAYED pending the Court's Order on Defendant's Motion to Transfer (ECF No. 24). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) NOTICE Joint Claim Construction Statement by Express Mobile, Inc. (Kramer, Robert) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) BRIEF by eBay Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Morton, #2 Exhibit V, #3 Exhibit W, #4 Exhibit X, #5 Exhibit Y, #6 Affidavit Schmandt, #7 Affidavit Brausa, #8 Exhibit 24, #9 Exhibit 25, #10 Exhibit 26, #11 Exhibit 27, #12 Exhibit 28, #13 Exhibit 29, #14 Exhibit 30)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Sal Lim ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13923067) by on behalf of Express Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Margaret Elizabeth Day ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13923066) by on behalf of Express Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Robert F. Kramer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13923064) by on behalf of Express Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Robert F. Kramer,M. Elizabeth Day, David Alberti, Sal Lim, Russell Tonkovich, Marc Belloli for Express Mobile, Inc.. (am) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to eBay Inc.. (am) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Bunt, Robert) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/1/2020) (am). (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Bunt, Robert) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/1/2020) (am). (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13918776). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Bunt, Robert) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/1/2020) (am). (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EBAY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Express Mobile, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Will Melehani

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jared Bobrow Esq.