This case was last updated from PACER on 04/17/2021 at 09:21:02 (UTC).

Express Mobile, Inc. v. Dropbox, Inc.

Case Summary

On February 16, 2021, Express Mobile, Inc. (“Express Mobile” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Stuart George Gross of Gross & Klein, LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against (“Dropbox” or “Defendant”) seeking damages and ongoing royalty for allegedly infringing Express Mobile’s intellectual property relating to Browser Based Web Site Generation Tool and Run Time Engine and various other technologies. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Northern District of California with Judge Richard Seeborg presiding. 

 

The Plaintiff alleged that the Defendants have allegedly infringed one or more claims under United States Patent Numbers 6,546,397 entitled “Browser Based Web Site Generation Tool and Run Time Engine” (“the ‘397 Patent”), 9,063,755 entitled “Systems and Methods for Presenting Information on Mobile Devices” (“the ‘755 Patent”),  9,471,287 entitled “Systems and Methods for Integrating Widgets on Mobile Devices” (“the ‘287 Patent”) and 9,928,044 entitled “Systems and Methods for Programming Mobile Devices” (“the ‘044 Patent”) owned by Plaintiff.

 

The Plaintiff alleged that “Dropbox induced others to infringe at least claim 1 of the ’397 patent under 35 U.S.C. § 271(b) by, among other things, and with specific intent or willful blindness, actively aiding and abetting others to infringe, including but not limited to Dropbox’s partners, clients, customers, and end users, whose use of Paper constituted direct infringement of at least one claim of the ’397 patent. In particular, Dropbox’s actions that aided and abetted others such as customers, clients, partners, developers, and end users to infringe include advertising Paper as a way for users to collaborate on webpages (advertised as “documents” or “Docs”) available on the Web.” and that “Dropbox also ran graphic advertisements on its website featuring infringing features of Paper. For example, Dropbox ran advertisements explaining that Paper Docs could be used to create webpages housing internal company resources and emphasizing that Paper Docs could be easily edited in “real-time.”

 

Plaintiff further alleged that “Dropbox infringes claim 23 of the ’755 patent through a combination of features that collectively practice each limitation of claim 23. Paper practices a method for providing information to a device having a display, including a web browser. The information comes from a web service, the Paper web server.” and further that “Dropbox infringes claim 15 of the ’287 patent through a combination of features that collectively practice each limitation of claim 15. Paper practices a method for displaying content on a display of a computer device having a Player – HTML, CSS, and JavaScript code written for a particular device platform, such as browsers, laptops, tablets, and smartphones. The content is provided to the user through a web browser on webpages called Paper Docs.”

 

Four claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff are for the alleged infringement of one or more claims of the ‘397, Patent, the ‘755 Patent, the ‘287 Patent, and ‘044 Patent respectively.

 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff has requested the court to pass an order that Defendant has infringed the ’397, ’755, ’287, and ’044 patents, that Plaintiff is entitled to damages and royalty for infringement of the ’397, ’755, ’287, and ’044 patents along with the costs of action. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents

 

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01145

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard Seeborg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Express Mobile, Inc.

Defendant

Dropbox, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stuart George Gross

Attorney at Gross & Klein, LLP

Pier 9, Suite 100

San Francisco, CA 94111

Timothy Sward Kline

Attorney at Gross & Klein LLP

Pier 9, Suite 100

San Francisco, CA 94111

Sarah J Newman

600 New Hampshire Ave., Nw, Suite 500

Washington, DC 20037

Steven F Molo

Attorney at MoloLamken LLP

430 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10022

George Alexander Croton

Attorney at Gross & Klein LLP

Suite 100

San Francisco, CA 94111

Leonid Grinberg

Attorney at MoloLamken LLP

430 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Benoit Quarmby

430 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Defendant Attorneys

Irene Inkyu Yang

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 California Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94104

Saurabh Prabhakar

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 California Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94104

Michael J. Bettinger

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 California Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94104

Sue Wang

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 California Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#29

#28

27 #1

Proposed Order

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#17

#6

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

24 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying #27 Motion to Stay. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2021) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #27 MOTION to Stay PENDING EX PARTE REEXAMINATION OF THE 397 PATENT ) filed byExpress Mobile, Inc.. (Molo, Steven) (Filed on 4/2/2021) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION to Stay PENDING EX PARTE REEXAMINATION OF THE 397 PATENT filed by Dropbox, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 4/2/2021. Replies due by 4/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yang, Irene) (Filed on 3/19/2021) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Refund Status re #24 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2021) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER RE POTENTIAL STAY MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/12/2021. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2021) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-15582502 by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/11/2021) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Refund Status re #17 Application for Refund: Declined. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2021) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Saurabh Prabhakar (Prabhakar, Saurabh) (Filed on 3/10/2021) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Sue Wang (Wang, Sue) (Filed on 3/10/2021) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Bettinger (Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 3/10/2021) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15605493.) filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Quarmby, Benoit) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15605464.) filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Molo, Steven) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15605394.) filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Grinberg, Leonid) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/13/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Dropbox, Inc. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Express Mobile, Inc. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 2/16/2021) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 2/16/2021) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 2/16/2021) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Dropbox, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15582525.). Filed byExpress Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 2/16/2021) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DROPBOX. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Express Mobile, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy Sward Kline

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benoit Quarmby