This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 10:23:25 (UTC).

Exela Pharma Sciences, LLC v. Sandoz, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/14/2020 Exela Pharma Sciences, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Sandoz, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00645

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Exela Pharma Sciences, LLC

Defendant

Sandoz, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert M. Oakes

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

Defendant Attorney

Dominick T. Gattuso

Attorney at Heyman Enerio Gattuso & Hirzel LLP

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 200

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME For Defendant Sandoz Inc. to Answer, Move or otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint to July 15, 2020 - filed by Sandoz, Inc. (Gattuso, Dominick) Modified on 6/16/2020 (dlw). (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Dominick T. Gattuso on behalf of Sandoz, Inc. (Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

12 #7

Exhibit G

12 #6

Exhibit F

12 #5

Exhibit E

12 #4

Exhibit D

12 #3

Exhibit C

12 #2

Exhibit B

12 #1

Exhibit A

#12

(#12) REDACTED VERSION of #11 Amended Complaint, by Exela Pharma Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

10 #7

Exhibit G

10 #6

Exhibit F

10 #5

Exhibit E

10 #4

Exhibit D

10 #3

Exhibit C

10 #2

Exhibit B

10 #1

Exhibit A

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: The Docket Text of D.I. 14 and the corresponding SO ORDERED have been updated to reflect the extension date of July instead of June. (dlw) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME For Defendant Sandoz Inc. to Answer, Move or otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint to July 15, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Sandoz, Inc. answer due 7/15/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/4/2020. (dlw) Modified on 6/16/2020 (dlw). (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME For Defendant Sandoz Inc. to Answer, Move or otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint to July 15, 2020 - filed by Sandoz, Inc. (Gattuso, Dominick) Modified on 6/16/2020 (dlw). (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Dominick T. Gattuso on behalf of Sandoz, Inc. (Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REDACTED VERSION of #11 Amended Complaint, by Exela Pharma Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) [SEALED] AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sandoz, Inc.- filed by Exela Pharma Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C, #4 Ex.D, #5 Ex. E, #6 Ex. F, #7 Ex. G)(Oakes, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2020: #8 Redline Comparison) (dlw). (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REDACTED VERSION of #2 Complaint, by Exela Pharma Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Exela Pharma Sciences, LLC. Sandoz, Inc. served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketRemark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (lak) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to file Complaint Under Seal. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/14/2020. (lak) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketRemark: Exit electronic copies to Duty Judge (MN) (related cases). (lak) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Sandoz, Inc. on 5/14/2020. (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (lak) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Exela PharmSci, Inc., Corporate Parent Exela Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Exela PharmSci Private Limited for Exela Pharma Sciences, LLC filed by Exela Pharma Sciences, LLC. (lak) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,478,453 ;10,583,155. (lak) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 4/3/2020. Date of Expiration of Patent: 1/15/2039.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 10/3/2022. (lak) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) [SEALED] COMPLAINT filed against Sandoz, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-2930995.) - filed by Exela Pharma Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to file Complaint Under Seal - filed by Exela Pharma Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(lak) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EXELA PHARMA SCIENCES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sandoz Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dominick T. Gattuso