This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 08:16:45 (UTC).

Exafer Ltd v. Microsoft Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Exafer Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Microsoft Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00687

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Exafer Ltd

Defendant

Microsoft Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raymond W Mort, III

Attorney at The Mort Law Firm, PLLC

100 Congress Ave, Suite 2000

Austin, TX 78701

Defendant Attorneys

M. Brett Johnson

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

2121 N. Pearl Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Katherine Kelly Vidal

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

275 Middlefield Road, Suite 205

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Samantha M. Lerner

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

35 W. Wacker Drive, Suite 4100

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by M. Brett Johnson of Samantha M. Lerner ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13017929) by on behalf of Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, M.) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katherine Kelly Vidal ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13011741) by on behalf of Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vidal, Katherine) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#8

(#8) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Johnson, M.) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint For Patent Infringement by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, M.) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Brett Johnson on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Johnson, M.) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

#5

(#5) Court's Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lad) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Microsoft Corporation. (lad) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Exafer Ltd. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#2

(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Exafer Ltd. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #14

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #13

Exhibit

1 #12

Exhibit

1 #11

Exhibit

1 #10

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12922816). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Exafer Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by M. Brett Johnson of Samantha M. Lerner ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13017929) by on behalf of Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, M.) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Microsoft Corporation answer due 2/10/2020. (lad) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 12/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including February 10, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 12/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katherine Kelly Vidal ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13011741) by on behalf of Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vidal, Katherine) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Johnson, M.) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint For Patent Infringement by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, M.) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Brett Johnson on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Johnson, M.) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Court's Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lad) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Microsoft Corporation. (lad) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Exafer Ltd. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Exafer Ltd. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12922816). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Exafer Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.