This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 11:32:22 (UTC).

EXACTECH US INC v. MIDWEST MEDICAL SOLUTIONS LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 EXACTECH US INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MIDWEST MEDICAL SOLUTIONS LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK E WALKER and GARY R JONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00057

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK E WALKER

Referral Judge

GARY R JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EXACTECH U.S., INC.

EXACTECH US INC

Defendants

HUGH BRADLEY

MIDWEST MEDICAL SOLUTIONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LORENCE JON BIELBY

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

101 E College Ave, Po Drawer 1838

Tallahassee, FL 32302-1838

JOHN K LONDOT

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

101 E College Ave, Po Drawer 1838

Tallahassee, FL 32302-1838

Defendant Attorney

DORI K STIBOLT

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP - WEST PALM BEACH FL

777 South Flagler Ave, Suite 1700 West Tower

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT re 12 Interdistrict Transfer to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota, Minneapolis Division. (New USDC Minnesota case number: 0:19-cv-1115.) (kdm) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' #4 MOTION TO TRANSFER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/24/2019. The Clerk must take all steps necessary to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota. The Clerk must close the file. (kdm) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by MIDWEST MEDICAL SOLUTIONS LLC. (STIBOLT, DORI) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Minnesota or in the alternative, MOTION to Stay filed by EXACTECH US INC. (LONDOT, JOHN) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Minnesota or in the alternative, MOTION to Stay filed by EXACTECH US INC. (LONDOT, JOHN) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#7

(#7) Defendants ANSWER to Complaint by HUGH BRADLEY, MIDWEST MEDICAL SOLUTIONS LLC. (STIBOLT, DORI) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by EXACTECH US INC. (BIELBY, LORENCE) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

4 #2

Affidavit Eric J. Nystrom

4 #1

Affidavit Hugh Bradley

#4

(#4) MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Minnesota or in the alternative, ( (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/15/2019).), MOTION to Stay by HUGH BRADLEY, MIDWEST MEDICAL SOLUTIONS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Hugh Bradley, #2 Affidavit Eric J. Nystrom) (STIBOLT, DORI) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (kdm) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit State Court Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit State Court documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HUGH BRADLEY, MIDWEST MEDICAL SOLUTIONS LLC from Alachua Circuit Court, case number 2019CA000824. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4442796.), filed by HUGH BRADLEY, MIDWEST MEDICAL SOLUTIONS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (STIBOLT, DORI) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT re 12 Interdistrict Transfer to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota, Minneapolis Division. (New USDC Minnesota case number: 0:19-cv-1115.) (kdm) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • (#12) Interdistrict Transfer to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota, Minneapolis Division located at United States Courthouse, 300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202, Minneapolis, MN 55415. (kdm) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' #4 MOTION TO TRANSFER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/24/2019. The Clerk must take all steps necessary to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota. The Clerk must close the file. (kdm) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by MIDWEST MEDICAL SOLUTIONS LLC. (STIBOLT, DORI) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #5 INITIAL Scheduling Order -- Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 4/15/2019. (None filed to date as to MIDWEST MEDICAL SOLUTIONS LLC.) (kdm) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Minnesota or in the alternative, MOTION to Stay filed by EXACTECH US INC. (LONDOT, JOHN) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Minnesota or in the alternative, MOTION to Stay filed by EXACTECH US INC. (LONDOT, JOHN) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Defendants ANSWER to Complaint by HUGH BRADLEY, MIDWEST MEDICAL SOLUTIONS LLC. (STIBOLT, DORI) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by EXACTECH US INC. (BIELBY, LORENCE) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/1/2019. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 4/15/2019., Joint Status Report on Discovery due by 5/1/2019., Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/15/2019., Discovery due by 7/30/2019., Dispositive Motions to be filed by 8/20/2019. (kdm) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Minnesota or in the alternative, ( (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/15/2019).), MOTION to Stay by HUGH BRADLEY, MIDWEST MEDICAL SOLUTIONS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Hugh Bradley, #2 Affidavit Eric J. Nystrom) (STIBOLT, DORI) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (kdm) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Filing Exhibit to Notice of Removal by HUGH BRADLEY, MIDWEST MEDICAL SOLUTIONS LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Civil Cover Sheet) (STIBOLT, DORI) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HUGH BRADLEY, MIDWEST MEDICAL SOLUTIONS LLC from Alachua Circuit Court, case number 2019CA000824. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4442796.), filed by HUGH BRADLEY, MIDWEST MEDICAL SOLUTIONS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (STIBOLT, DORI) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less