This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/29/2023 at 11:10:56 (UTC).

Ewing's Love & Hope Preschool & Academy, Inc. et al v. Markel Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 Ewing's Love Hope Preschool Academy, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Markel Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Henry Lee Adams, Jr and Monte C. Richardson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01314

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Henry Lee Adams, Jr

Referral Judge

Monte C. Richardson

 

Party Details

Counter Defendants and Plaintiffs

EWING'S LOVE & HOPE PRESCHOOL & ACADEMY, INC.

DARRYL EWING

Counter Claimant and Defendant

Markel Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephanie Miles

Attorney at Cathey & MIles, P.A.

P.O. Box 2005

St. Petersburg, FL 33737

Brandon Graham Cathey

Attorney at Cathey & Miles, P.A.

P.O. Box 2005

St. Petersburg, FL 33737

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Katherine Anne Coba

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd., Suite 4Th Floor

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Jorge Alexander Maza

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd.,, 4Th Floor

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Francesco J. Palanda

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

2525 Ponce De Leon Boulevard, Suite 4Th Floor

Coral Gables, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Miles, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

#16

(#16) REPLY to #12 Counterclaim by Darryl Ewing, Ewing's Love & Hope Preschool & Academy, Inc..(Miles, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Francesco J. Palanda on behalf of Markel Insurance Company (Palanda, Francesco) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

14 #5

Exhibit E - Final Judgment

14 #4

Exhibit D - Cancellation Endorsement

14 #3

Exhibit C - Notice of Cancellation

14 #2

Exhibit B - Premium Finance Agreement

14 #1

Exhibit A - Policy

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Markel Insurance Company. (Maza, Jorge) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

#12

(#12) Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Darryl Ewing, Ewing's Love & Hope Preschool & Academy, Inc. by Markel Insurance Company.(Maza, Jorge) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Anne Coba on behalf of Markel Insurance Company (Coba, Katherine) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

1 #5

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Letter from Hinshaw Declining Coverage

1 #2

Exhibit Verdict and Resulting Final Judgment

1 #1

Exhibit Policy

1 #1

Main Document

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Miles, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY to #12 Counterclaim by Darryl Ewing, Ewing's Love & Hope Preschool & Academy, Inc..(Miles, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Francesco J. Palanda on behalf of Markel Insurance Company (Palanda, Francesco) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of filing Exhibits by Markel Insurance Company re #12 Answer to Complaint Counterclaim, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Premium Finance Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Cancellation, #4 Exhibit D - Cancellation Endorsement, #5 Exhibit E - Final Judgment)(Maza, Jorge) (Modified on 12/29/2022 to edit text) (SJW). (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Markel Insurance Company. (Maza, Jorge) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Darryl Ewing, Ewing's Love & Hope Preschool & Academy, Inc. by Markel Insurance Company.(Maza, Jorge) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Anne Coba on behalf of Markel Insurance Company (Coba, Katherine) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jorge Alexander Maza on behalf of Markel Insurance Company (Maza, Jorge) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF of service executed on 12/6/22 as to Markel Insurance Company filed by Darryl Ewing, Ewing's Love & Hope Preschool & Academy, Inc. (Miles, Stephanie) (Modified on 12/9/2022 to edit text) (SJW). (Entered: 12/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MO) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7.1 and Local Rule 3.03 disclosure statement by Darryl Ewing, Ewing's Love & Hope Preschool & Academy, Inc.. (Miles, Stephanie) (Modified on 12/9/2022 to edit text) (SJW). (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Stephanie Miles on behalf of Darryl Ewing, Ewing's Love & Hope Preschool & Academy, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Brandon Cathey. (Miles, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of a related action Lancia Isaac, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Brooklyn Blount, deceased, v. Ewing's Love & Hope Preschool & Academy, Inc., a Florida Profit Corporation, and Darryl Ewing, in the Fourth Judicial Circuit, in and for Duval County, 16-2019-CA-005834 per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Darryl Ewing, Ewing's Love & Hope Preschool & Academy, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Miles, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SJW) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Markel Insurance Company. (SJW) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:22-cv-1314-HLA-MCR. (SJB) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Markel Insurance Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20253287) filed by EWING'S LOVE & HOPE PRESCHOOL & ACADEMY, INC., DARRYL EWING. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy, #2 Exhibit Verdict and Resulting Final Judgment, #3 Exhibit Letter from Hinshaw Declining Coverage, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Cathey, Brandon) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less