This case was last updated from PACER on 07/06/2019 at 07:01:40 (UTC).

Ewing v. Pollard

Case Summary

On 05/07/2019 Ewing filed an Other lawsuit against Pollard. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Bernard G. Skomal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00855

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cathy Ann Bencivengo

Referral Judge

Bernard G. Skomal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anton Ewing

San Diego, CA 92117

Defendant

Mark Pollard

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Unavailability by Anton Ewing (anh) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER Denying Ex Parte Request to Serve by Publication [Doc. no. #5 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 6/21/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (jxv) (jao). (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Mark Pollard ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CAS111573.), filed by Anton Ewing. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Reciept of Payment)The new case number is 3:19-cv-00855-MMA-BGS. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Ewing, Anton)(jxv) (jao). (Entered: 05/07/2019)

1 #2

Reciept of Payment

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anton Ewing. Mark Pollard served. (anh) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Service by Publication by Anton Ewing. (anh) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anton Ewing. Mark Pollard served. (anh) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER Denying Ex Parte Request to Serve by Publication [Doc. no. #5 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 6/21/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Service by Publication by Anton Ewing. (anh) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Unavailability by Anton Ewing (anh) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Michael M. Anello is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19-CV-00855-CAB-BGS.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (als) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (jxv) (jao). (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Mark Pollard ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CAS111573.), filed by Anton Ewing. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Reciept of Payment)The new case number is 3:19-cv-00855-MMA-BGS. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Ewing, Anton)(jxv) (jao). (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.