This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/04/2023 at 07:27:16 (UTC).

Ewers v. PlainsCapital Bank

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 Ewers filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against PlainsCapital Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00005

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Appellee

PlainsCapital Bank

In Re

Rayburn Otto Ewers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorney

Michael J. Durrschmidt

Attorney at Hirsch & Westheimer, P.C.

1415 Louisiana, 36Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

In Re Attorneys

Clinton W. Twaddell, III

Attorney at Branscomb PC

802 N. Carancahua - Ste 1900

Corpus Christi, TX 78401-0036

Michael V. Baumer

Attorney at Law Office of Michael Baumer

7600 Burnet Road, Suite 530

Austin, TX 78757

 

Court Documents

8 #2

Designated Documents

8 #1

Appellant's Designation of Record

8 #8

Main Document

7 #1

Adversary docket sheet

7 #7

Main Document

6 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4

6 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3

6 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

6 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

6 #6

Main Document

5 #1

Exhibit EXH 1: Docket Sheet

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clinton W. Twaddell, III on behalf of Rayburn Otto Ewers. Attorney Clinton W. Twaddell, III added to party Rayburn Otto Ewers(pty:inre) (Twaddell, Clinton) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#3

(#3) ATTACHMENT to #1 Notice of Opening Bankruptcy Case, Order on Appeal. (Lawson, Rob) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

1 #4

LtrTrnNtcDCAP

1 #3

List of Parties

1 #1

Orders on Appeal

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Transmitted to District Court. The Appellant's designation of the record on appeal is complete. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation of Record, #2 Designated Documents) (Lawson, Rob) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Transmitted to District Court. The Bankruptcy Record on Appeal cannot be Certified as Complete. The Appellant has not filed with the Bankruptcy Clerk a designation of the items to be included in the record on appeal and a statement of the issues to be presented as required by Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009(a). (Attachments: #1 Adversary docket sheet) (Turner, Blayne) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Appeal Without Prejudice by Rayburn Otto Ewers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Twaddell, Clinton) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATEMENT OF ISSUES by Rayburn Otto Ewers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXH 1: Docket Sheet)(Twaddell, Clinton) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clinton W. Twaddell, III on behalf of Rayburn Otto Ewers. Attorney Clinton W. Twaddell, III added to party Rayburn Otto Ewers(pty:inre) (Twaddell, Clinton) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTACHMENT to #1 Notice of Opening Bankruptcy Case, Order on Appeal. (Lawson, Rob) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted. (rn) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell (rn) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rn) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Opening Bankruptcy Case on Notice of Appeal received from Bankruptcy Court. Notification sent to TXW BK Court. Pursuant to FRBP 8003(d), the Bankruptcy Clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal to District Court. Record on Appeal to follow. (Attachments: #1 Orders on Appeal, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 List of Parties, #4 LtrTrnNtcDCAP) (ta) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less