This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2020 at 09:53:07 (UTC).

E.W. et al v. Cannon County Board of Education

Case Summary

On 04/10/2020 E W filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Cannon County Board of Education. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alistair Newbern and William L. Campbell, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00307

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

W.W.

E.W.

Defendant

Cannon County Board of Education

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Roger Steven Waldron

Attorney at Waldron, Fann & Parsley

101 N. Maple Street

Murfreesboro, TN 37130

Steven C Fann

Attorney at Waldron, Fann & Parsley

101 N. Maple Street

Murfreesboro, TN 37130

Defendant Attorney

Kenneth S. Williams

Attorney at Madewell, Jared, Halfacre, Williams & Wilson

230 N Washington Avenue

Cookeville, TN 38501

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. The initial case management conference is RESET for July 10, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 5/29/2020. (vh) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by E.W., W.W.. (Waldron, Roger) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER: This matter is set for an initial case management conference on June 8, 2020. (Doc. No. #4 .) The conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Counsel need not and should not appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 5/27/2020. (vh) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Cannon County Board of Education.(Williams, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth S. Williams on behalf of All Defendants (Williams, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 4/13/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/8/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons issued as to Cannon County Board of Education. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

1 #4

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - 5/09/19 letter from William Curtis to Chris Wilkes

1 #2

Exhibit B - 4/04/11 "Dear Colleague" letter

1 #1

Exhibit A - 4/24/15 "Dear Colleague" letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Cannon County Board of Education (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3122032), filed by W.W., E.W. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 4/24/15 "Dear Colleague" letter, #2 Exhibit B - 4/04/11 "Dear Colleague" letter, #3 Exhibit C - 5/09/19 letter from William Curtis to Chris Wilkes, #4 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference by Telephone reset for 7/10/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (vh) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. The initial case management conference is RESET for July 10, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 5/29/2020. (vh) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by E.W., W.W.. (Waldron, Roger) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: This matter is set for an initial case management conference on June 8, 2020. (Doc. No. #4 .) The conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Counsel need not and should not appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 5/27/2020. (vh) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Cannon County Board of Education.(Williams, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Kenneth S. Williams. (mg) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth S. Williams on behalf of All Defendants (Williams, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 4/13/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/8/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons issued as to Cannon County Board of Education. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Roger Steven Waldron, Steven C Fann. (mg) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cannon County Board of Education (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3122032), filed by W.W., E.W. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 4/24/15 "Dear Colleague" letter, #2 Exhibit B - 4/04/11 "Dear Colleague" letter, #3 Exhibit C - 5/09/19 letter from William Curtis to Chris Wilkes, #4 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WW is a litigant

Latest cases where EW is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth S. Williams