This case was last updated from PACER on 04/16/2019 at 07:34:49 (UTC).

EVS Codec Technologies LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 02/15/2019 EVS Codec Technologies LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against ZTE Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Barbara M.G. Lynn and Irma Carrillo Ramirez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00385

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara M.G. Lynn

Referral Judge

Irma Carrillo Ramirez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

EVS Codec Technologies LLC

Saint Lawrence Communications LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

ZTE USA Inc

ZTE Corporation

ZTE (TX) Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Demetrios Anaipakos

Attorney at Ahmad Zavitsanos Anaipakos Alavi & Mensing PC

2500 One Houston Center, 1221 Mckinney

Houston, TX 77010

Justin Yee-Jin Chen

Attorney at Ahmad, Zavitsanos, Anaipakos, Alavi & Mensing P.C.

1221 Mckinney, Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Weining Bai

Attorney at Ahmad Zavitsanas Anaipakos Alavi & Mensing PC

1221 Mckinney Street, Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Brian Ervin Simmons

Attorney at Ahmad, Zavitsanos, Anaipakos, Alavi & Mensing P.C.

1221 Mckinney, Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Amir H Alavi

Attorney at Ahmad Zavitsanos Anaipakos Alavi & Mensing, P.C.

2500 One Houston Center, 1221 Mckinney

Houston, TX 77010

Masood Anjom

Attorney at Ahmad Zavitsanas Anaipakos Alavi & Mensing PC

1221 Mckinney Street, Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Alisa Anne Lipski

Attorney at Ahmad Zavitsanas Anaipakos Alavi & Mensing PC

1221 Mckinney Street, Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Michael Dean McBride

Attorney at Ahmad Zavitsanas Anaipakos Alavi & Mensing PC

1221 Mckinney Street, Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Scott W Clark

Attorney at Ahmad, Zavitsanos, Anaipakos, Alavi & Mensing P.C.

1221 Mckinney, Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Michael Alexander Killingsworth

Attorney at Ahmad Zavitsanas Anaipakos Alavi & Mensing PC

1221 Mckinney Street, Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Scott Wayne Clark

Attorney at Ahmad Zavitsanas Anaipakos Alavi & Mensing PC

1221 Mckinney Street, Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Erik J Dykema

Attorney at Upshaw PLLC - Dallas

1204 Gano Street

Dallas, TX 75215

Ravinder Singh Deol

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

1717 Main Street, Suite 2800

Dallas, TX 75201

Keana Theresa Taylor

Attorney at Upshaw PLLC

1204 Gano Street

Dallas, TX 75215

Rachel E. Burnim

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP - San Francisco

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Harold Davis Davis, Jr

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP - San Francisco

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Nelson Moon Hua

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

1717 Main St. Ste. 2800

Dallas, TX 75201

Adam Cooper

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

1717 Main Street, Suite 2800

Dallas, TX 75201

Harold H. Davis, Jr.

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

4 Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Rachel E Burnim

4 Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

77 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#77

#76

#75

#74

#73

#72

71 #1

Exhibit(s) A - Proposed Protective Order

#71

#70

#69

62 #2

Exhibit(s) B

62 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#62

#8

#7

#6

#5

118 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#77) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND Third Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against ZTE Corporation, ZTE USA Inc filed by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC, EVS Codec Technologies LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#76) ORDER: FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 5/10/2019 03:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1570, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/8/2019) (epm) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#75) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Masood Anjom on behalf of Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Anjom, Masood) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#74) ANSWER to #62 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by ZTE USA Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., Amended COUNTERCLAIM against EVS Codec Technologies LLC, Saint Lawrence Communications LLC filed by ZTE USA Inc (Davis, Harold) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#73) PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/26/2019) (svc) Modified docket text on 3/27/2019 (zkc). (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#72) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/15/2019 11:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1570, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/26/2019) (svc) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#71) Joint Motion for Entry of Proposed Protective Order filed by EVS Codec Technologies LLC, Saint Lawrence Communications LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Proposed Protective Order) (Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#70) NOTICE of Compliance Regarding Initial Disclosures filed by EVS Codec Technologies LLC, Saint Lawrence Communications LLC (Simmons, Brian) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) Designation of Mediator by EVS Codec Technologies LLC, Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. (Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order Joint Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order by EVS Codec Technologies LLC, Saint Lawrence Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Dean McBride on behalf of EVS Codec Technologies, LLC (McBride, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.] (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Masood Anjom on behalf of EVS Codec Technologies, LLC (Anjom, Masood) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.] (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Ervin Simmons on behalf of EVS Codec Technologies, LLC (Simmons, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.] (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amir H. Alavi on behalf of EVS Codec Technologies, LLC (Alavi, Amir) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.] (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Demetrios Anaipakos on behalf of EVS Codec Technologies, LLC (Anaipakos, Demetrios) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.] (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.] (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.] (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued as to ZTE (TX), Inc. c/o Ferguson, Braswell & Fraser, PC, ZTE Corporation, ZTE USA, Inc. c/o Incorp Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) ZTE Corporation, #2 Summons(es) \ZTE USA, Inc.)(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.] (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Anaipakos, Demetrios) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.] (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ZTE (TX), Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6886197.), filed by EVS Codec Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anaipakos, Demetrios) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.] (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZTE USA Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where EVS Codec Technologies LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ZTE (USA), Inc. is a litigant