This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2021 at 14:44:25 (UTC).

EVOLVE INTERACTIVE LLC v. LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.

Case Summary

On October 11, 2021, Evolve Interactive LLC (“Evolve” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Richard Charles Weinblatt of Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against LG Electronics U.S.A. (“Defendant”), seeking damages, costs, interests and other reliefs for the alleged infringement of the United States Patent owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the District of New Jersey with Judge Cathy L. Waldor and Judge John Michael Vazquez presiding.

 

This complaint arises from Defendants’ alleged unlawful infringement of the United States patent owned by Plaintiff: United States Patent Nos. 7,068,596, entitled "Interactive Data Transmission System Having Staged Servers" (the "'596 patent" or the “Patent-in-suit”).

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Without license or authorization and in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271(a), Defendant is liable for infringement of at least claim 24 of the '596 patent by making, using, importing, offering for sale, and/or selling, systems and methods for interactively controlling from one of a plurality of network devices a flow of audio visual data from a central server to the network device, including, but not limited to, IPTV (the "Accused Instrumentality"), because each and every element is met either literally or equivalently.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Upon information and belief, Defendant installed, used and tested the Accused Instrumentality in its airplanes in the United States, directly infringing one or more claims of the '596 patent. The Accused Instrumentality satisfies each and every element of each asserted claim of the '596 patent, either literally or under the doctrine of equivalents. An exemplary preliminary claim chart illustrating infringement of claim 24 is attached hereto as Exhibit B, and incorporated herein by reference.”

 

Further, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Evolve is entitled to recover from Defendant the damages sustained by Evolve as a result of Defendant's infringement of the '596 patent in an amount subject to proof at trial, which, by law, cannot be less than a reasonable royalty, together with interest and costs as fixed by this Court under 35 U.S.C. § 284.”

 

There is one claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff which is for the alleged infringement of the Patent-in-suit. 



In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the Court to pass a judgment in favor of Plaintiff adjudicating that Defendant has infringed the '596 patent and award damages to be paid by Defendant adequate to compensate Evolve for Defendant's past infringement of the '596 patent and any continuing or future infringement through the date such judgment is entered, including interest, costs, expenses and an accounting of all infringing acts including, but not limited to, those acts not presented at trial. The Plaintiff further requested the Court for a judgment and order finding this is an exceptional case within the meaning of 35 U.S.C. § 285 and award costs of litigation. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-18412

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Michael Vazquez

Referral Judge

Cathy L. Waldor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVOLVE INTERACTIVE LLC

Defendant

LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARD CHARLES WEINBLATT

Attorney at STAMOULIS & WEINBLATT LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS ISSUED as to LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (sm) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, ) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by EVOLVE INTERACTIVE LLC Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (WEINBLATT, RICHARD) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by EVOLVE INTERACTIVE LLC Rule 7.1.1 Disclosure Statement (WEINBLATT, RICHARD) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EVOLVE INTERACTIVE LLC. (WEINBLATT, RICHARD) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Summons to be Issued by EVOLVE INTERACTIVE LLC as to LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.. (WEINBLATT, RICHARD) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12882403) with JURY DEMAND , Related Case Selected, filed by EVOLVE INTERACTIVE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(WEINBLATT, RICHARD) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Charles Weinblatt