This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/18/2020 at 10:47:43 (UTC).

Evolve Interactive LLC v. Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 Evolve Interactive LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00654

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Evolve Interactive LLC

Defendant

Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Raymond W Mort, III

Attorney at The Mort Law Firm, PLLC

100 Congress Ave, Suite 2000

Austin, TX 78701

Richard C. Weinblatt

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew William Cornelia

Attorney at McGuire Woods LLP

2000 Mckinney Ave., Suite 1400

Dallas, TX 75214

Eric Stephen Schlichter

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

600 Travis St., Suite 7500

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Pro Hac Vice Letter to David E. Finkelson for Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc.. (am) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schlichter, Eric) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schlichter, Eric) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13813938) by on behalf of Evolve Interactive LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc.. (am) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Evolve Interactive LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#2

(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Evolve Interactive LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13779053), filed by Evolve Interactive LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew William Cornelia on behalf of David E. Finkelson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13971901) by on behalf of Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cornelia, Matthew) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc. answer due 10/2/2020. (am) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Because the Court limits extensions to 45 days absent good cause, the Court PARTIALLY GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including October 2, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 09/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Pro Hac Vice Letter to David E. Finkelson for Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc.. (am) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schlichter, Eric) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc. answer due 9/16/2020. (am) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including September 16, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 08/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schlichter, Eric) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 08/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13813938) by on behalf of Evolve Interactive LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc.. (am) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Evolve Interactive LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Evolve Interactive LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13779053), filed by Evolve Interactive LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Charles Weinblatt

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raymond W Mort, III