This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2020 at 08:43:02 (UTC).

EVGA Corporation v. B and H Foto and Electronics Corp et al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 EVGA Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against B and H Foto and Electronics Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Autumn D. Spaeth and Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-02230

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVGA Corporation

Defendants

B&H Foto & Electronics Corp

DOES 1-10, inclusive

B and H Foto and Electronics Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian M Daucher

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter and Hampton LLP

650 Town Center Drive 10Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-1993

Chelsea A Fraley

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter and Hampton LLP

650 Town Center Drive 4Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Defendant Attorneys

Joshua Robert Mandell

Attorney at Akerman LLP

601 West Fifth Street Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Scott Kessler

Attorney at Akerman LLP

666 Fifth Avenue 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10103

Jonathan Michael Turner

Attorney at Akerman LLP

601 West 5Th Street Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01101394-CU-BC-CJC Receipt No: 0973-24793834 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant B&H Foto & Electronics Corp. (Attorney Joshua Robert Mandell added to party B&H Foto & Electronics Corp(pty:dft))(Mandell, Joshua) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant B&H Foto & Electronics Corp, (Mandell, Joshua) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference is set for 2/14/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. Review document for details. (tg) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant B&H Foto & Electronics Corp. (Mandell, Joshua) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #9 Non-Resident Attorney Scott Kessler APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant B and H Foto and Electronics Corp, designating Joshua R Mandell as local counsel. (jp) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#9

(#9) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Scott Kessler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant B and H Foto and Electronics Corp (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24843069) filed by Defendant B and H Foto and Electronics Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mandell, Joshua) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to B and H Foto and Electronics Corp answer now due 12/17/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff EVGA Corporation.(Daucher, Brian) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant B and H Foto and Electronics Corp, served on November 20, 2019. (Mandell, Joshua) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Scott Kessler on behalf of Defendant B and H Foto and Electronics Corp (Kessler, Scott) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendant B and H Foto and Electronics Corp.(Mandell, Joshua) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#6

(#6) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference is set for 2/14/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. Review document for details. (tg) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendant B and H Foto and Electronics Corp.(Mandell, Joshua) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Scott Kessler on behalf of Defendant B and H Foto and Electronics Corp (Kessler, Scott) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #9 Non-Resident Attorney Scott Kessler APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant B and H Foto and Electronics Corp, designating Joshua R Mandell as local counsel. (jp) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Scott Kessler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant B and H Foto and Electronics Corp (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24843069) filed by Defendant B and H Foto and Electronics Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mandell, Joshua) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to B and H Foto and Electronics Corp answer now due 12/17/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff EVGA Corporation.(Daucher, Brian) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant B and H Foto and Electronics Corp, served on November 20, 2019. (Mandell, Joshua) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants B and H Foto and Electronics Corp, Does 1-10. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff EVGA Corporation. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/30/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant B&H Foto & Electronics Corp, (Mandell, Joshua) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant B&H Foto & Electronics Corp. (Mandell, Joshua) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01101394-CU-BC-CJC Receipt No: 0973-24793834 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant B&H Foto & Electronics Corp. (Attorney Joshua Robert Mandell added to party B&H Foto & Electronics Corp(pty:dft))(Mandell, Joshua) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.