This case was last updated from PACER on 07/18/2020 at 13:01:12 (UTC).

Everman v. SPM Flow Control Inc

Case Summary

On 05/19/2020 Everman filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against SPM Flow Control Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen P. Friot. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00463

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen P. Friot

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nancy Everman

Defendant

SPM Flow Control Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amber L Hurst

Attorney at Hammons Hurst & Associates

325 Dean A Mcgee Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Mark E Hammons

Attorney at Hammons Hurst & Associates

325 Dean A Mcgee Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Brandon D Roberts

Attorney at Hammons Hurst & Associates

325 Dean A Mcgee Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorneys

C Eric Shephard

Attorney at Fellers Snider Blankenship Bailey & Tippens-OKC

100 N Broadway Ave, Suite 1700

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-8820

Greg A Castro

Attorney at Fellers Snider Blankenship Bailey & Tippens-OKC

100 N Broadway Ave, Suite 1700

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-8820

Rachel E Linzy

Attorney at The Kullman Law Firm-NEW ORLEANS

P O Box 60118, 1100 Poydras St, Suite 1600

New Orleans, LA 70160

Joseph R Ward, III

Attorney at The Kullman Law Firm-ENGLEWOOD

9800 Mount Pyramid Ct, Suite 400

Englewood, CO 80112

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Nancy Everman. (Hurst, Amber) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#16

(#16) ENTER ORDER. Under General Order 20-6, and in order to reduce in-person courthouse proceedings, the status/scheduling conference set for 7/20/2020 will be conducted telephonically. Counsel who plan to participate in the status/scheduling conference are DIRECTED to make arrangements for telephonic appearance not later than 7/15/2020, by contacting the courtroom deputy at the email address provided in this order. Entered at the direction of Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 6/30/2020. (llg) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#15

(#15) STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 7/20/2020 09:00 AM in Chambers before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Status Report due by 7/15/2020. (llg) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#14

(#14) ENTRY of Appearance by Rachel E Linzy on behalf of SPM Flow Control Inc (Linzy, Rachel) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#13

(#13) ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph R Ward, III on behalf of SPM Flow Control Inc (Ward, Joseph) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph R. Ward III; granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachel E. Linzy. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 6/1/2020. (llg) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rachel E. Linzy Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3163618 by SPM Flow Control Inc. (Castro, Greg) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by SPM Flow Control Inc.(Castro, Greg) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by SPM Flow Control Inc . (Shephard, C) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#7

(#7) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Plaintiffs. (Hurst, Amber) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

#6

(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Mark E Hammons on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hammons, Mark) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

#5

(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Brandon D Roberts on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Roberts, Brandon) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Amber L Hurst on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hurst, Amber) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

#3

(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by C Eric Shephard on behalf of SPM Flow Control Inc (Shephard, C) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#2

(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Greg A Castro on behalf of SPM Flow Control Inc (Castro, Greg) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Petition

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Canadian County, case number CJ-20-240 filed by SPM Flow Control Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Service of Process Notice, #4 Exhibit 4 - Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit 5 - Caminada Declaration, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(ank) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Nancy Everman. (Hurst, Amber) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ENTER ORDER. Under General Order 20-6, and in order to reduce in-person courthouse proceedings, the status/scheduling conference set for 7/20/2020 will be conducted telephonically. Counsel who plan to participate in the status/scheduling conference are DIRECTED to make arrangements for telephonic appearance not later than 7/15/2020, by contacting the courtroom deputy at the email address provided in this order. Entered at the direction of Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 6/30/2020. (llg) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 7/20/2020 09:00 AM in Chambers before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Status Report due by 7/15/2020. (llg) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ENTRY of Appearance by Rachel E Linzy on behalf of SPM Flow Control Inc (Linzy, Rachel) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph R Ward, III on behalf of SPM Flow Control Inc (Ward, Joseph) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph R. Ward III; granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachel E. Linzy. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 6/1/2020. (llg) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rachel E. Linzy Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3163618 by SPM Flow Control Inc. (Castro, Greg) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph R. Ward III Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3163611 by SPM Flow Control Inc. (Castro, Greg) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by SPM Flow Control Inc.(Castro, Greg) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by SPM Flow Control Inc . (Shephard, C) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Plaintiffs. (Hurst, Amber) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Mark E Hammons on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hammons, Mark) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Brandon D Roberts on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Roberts, Brandon) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Amber L Hurst on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hurst, Amber) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by C Eric Shephard on behalf of SPM Flow Control Inc (Shephard, C) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Greg A Castro on behalf of SPM Flow Control Inc (Castro, Greg) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3156422. (Castro, Greg) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Canadian County, case number CJ-20-240 filed by SPM Flow Control Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Service of Process Notice, #4 Exhibit 4 - Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit 5 - Caminada Declaration, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(ank) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandon D Roberts

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark E Hammons

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amber L Hurst