This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2020 at 07:47:25 (UTC).

Evergreen Marine Corp Taiwain Ltd. et al v. Master International Logistics China Co., Ltd.

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Evergreen Marine Corp Taiwain Ltd filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Master International Logistics China Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Karen L. Stevenson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-08725

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Evergreen Marine (Hong Kong) Ltd.

Evergreen Marine (UK) Limited

Evergreen Shipping Agency (America) Corporation

Evergreen Marine Corp (Taiwain) Ltd.

Italia Maritima SpA

Evergreen

Evergreen Marine Singapore PTD. Ltd.

Evergreen Shipping Agency America Corporation

Evergreen Marine Corp Taiwain Ltd.

Evergreen Marine UK Limited

Evergreen Marine Hong Kong Ltd.

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

Direct Service Inc.

Master International Logistics (China) CO., LTD

Master International Logistics China Co., Ltd.

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

3Rd Party Defendants

Roes

All-Ways Forwarding Intl Inc

Northpoint Trading, Inc

All-Ways Logistics (Asia Pacific) LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lynn L Krieger

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith LLP

333 Bush Street Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph N Mirkovich

Attorney at Russell Mirkovich and Morrow

One World Trade Center Suite 1660

Long Beach, CA 90831-1660

Margaret Eddy Morrow

Attorney at Russell Mirkovich and Morrow

One World Trade Center Suite 1660

Long Beach, CA 90831-1660

 

Court Documents

#30

#29

28 #2

Proposed Order

28 #1

Declaration of David Xue

#28

#27

#26

13 #1

Exhibit 1

#13

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT MASTER INTERNATIONAL LOGISTICS (CHINA) CO., LTD.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION (DKT. #28 ) by Judge John A Kronstadt: Master International Logistics (China) Co., Ltd. has set the motion for a day the Court's calendar is closed. Counsel are directed to refer to the Motion Calendar under this Courts Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court. Any future motion will be stricken for failing to set it on a date the Court is hearing motions. The Court, on its own motion, continues the Motion from December 28, 2020 to April 19, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel shall refer to the Courts Standing Order with respect to the briefing schedule of motions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv) (Entered: 11/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint #13 as to Third-Party Defendant Northpoint Trading, Inc. (jp) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Master International Logistics China Co., Ltd., (Mirkovich, Joseph) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Master International Logistics China Co., Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 12/28/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Xue, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Joseph N Mirkovich added to party Master International Logistics China Co., Ltd.(pty:dft)) (Mirkovich, Joseph) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint, #13 filed by Defendant and Third-Party Plaintiff Direct Service Inc.. (Mirkovich, Joseph) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by January 29, 2021. (droj) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Evergreen Shipping Agency America Corporation, Italia Maritima SpA, Evergreen Marine UK Limited, Evergreen Marine Corp Taiwain Ltd., Evergreen Marine Hong Kong Ltd., Evergreen Marine Singapore PTD. Ltd., upon Defendant Master International Logistics China Co., Ltd. served on 10/21/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Certificate of Service of Summons and Compalint on Master International Logistics (Krieger, Lynn) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint #13 as to Third-Party Defendant Northpoint Trading, Inc. (jp) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint #13 as to Third-Party Defendant All-Ways Forwarding Intl Inc. (jp) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint #13 as to Third-Party Defendant All-Ways Logistics (Asia Pacific) LLC. (jp) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Master International Logistics China Co., Ltd. (jp) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request, #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Evergreen Marine Corp Taiwain Ltd., Evergreen Marine Hong Kong Ltd., Evergreen Marine Singapore PTD. Ltd., Evergreen Marine UK Limited, Evergreen Shipping Agency America Corporation, Italia Maritima SpA. (Krieger, Lynn) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court&s Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (vv) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-08725 JAK(KSx). (rn) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Direct Service Inc. (car) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (car) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT FRCP & LCR 7.1 Nongovernmental Corporate Disclosure Statement and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Evergreen, Evergreen Marine (Hong Kong) Ltd., Evergreen Marine (UK) Limited, Evergreen Marine Corp (Taiwain) Ltd., Evergreen Shipping Agency (America) Corporation, Italia Maritima SpA identifying Evergreen as Corporate Parent. (Krieger, Lynn) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Evergreen, Evergreen Marine (Hong Kong) Ltd., Evergreen Marine (UK) Limited, Evergreen Marine Corp (Taiwain) Ltd., Evergreen Shipping Agency (America) Corporation, Italia Maritima SpA. (Krieger, Lynn) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Evergreen, Evergreen Marine (Hong Kong) Ltd., Evergreen Marine (UK) Limited, Evergreen Marine Corp (Taiwain) Ltd., Evergreen Shipping Agency (America) Corporation, Italia Maritima SpA. (Krieger, Lynn) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28206632 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Evergreen Shipping Agency (America) Corporation, Evergreen Marine Corp (Taiwain) Ltd., Evergreen Marine (Hong Kong) Ltd., Italia Maritima SpA, Evergreen Marine (UK) Limited, Evergreen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Lynn L Krieger added to party Evergreen(pty:pla), Attorney Lynn L Krieger added to party Evergreen Marine (Hong Kong) Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Lynn L Krieger added to party Evergreen Marine (UK) Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Lynn L Krieger added to party Evergreen Marine Corp (Taiwain) Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Lynn L Krieger added to party Evergreen Shipping Agency (America) Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Lynn L Krieger added to party Italia Maritima SpA(pty:pla))(Krieger, Lynn) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Evergreen Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Direct Service Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Italia Marittima Spa is a litigant

Latest cases where EVERGREEN SHIPPING AGENCY (AMERICA) CORPORATION is a litigant