This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2022 at 07:02:38 (UTC).

Evergreen Goodwill of Northwest Washington v. Affiliated FM Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 Evergreen Goodwill of Northwest Washington filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Affiliated FM Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara J. Rothstein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00755

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara J. Rothstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Evergreen Goodwill Of Northwest Washington

Defendant

Affiliated FM Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Franklin Dennis Cordell

Attorney at GORDON TILDEN THOMAS & CORDELL LLP

600 University Street, Ste 2915

Seattle, WA 98101

Samantha K Pitsch

Attorney at GORDON TILDEN THOMAS & CORDELL LLP

600 University Street, Ste 2915

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant Attorneys

Antoine Julian Smith

Attorney at BULLIVANT HOUSER BAILEY (SEA)

925 Fourth Ave Ste 3800

Seattle, WA 98104-1157

Daniel Rahn Bentson

Attorney at BULLIVANT HOUSER BAILEY (SEA)

925 Fourth Ave Ste 3800

Seattle, WA 98104-1157

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Complaint

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent FMIC Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Factory Mutual Insurance Company for Affiliated FM Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company (Bentson, Daniel) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#4

(#4) LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (JWC) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#6

(#6) MINUTE ORDER: This case is hereby transferred to the Honorable Barbara J. Rothstein. All future pleadings shall bear the case number C22-0755BJR. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (LH) (cc: Judge Robart chambers via ECF ad hoc) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#7

(#7) Stipulated MOTION to Stay re #1 Notice of Removal, , filed by Defendant Affiliated FM Insurance Company. (Bentson, Daniel) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Evergreen Goodwill of Northwest Washington (Cordell, Franklin) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting Parties' #7 Stipulated Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(MW) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting Parties' #7 Stipulated Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(MW) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Evergreen Goodwill of Northwest Washington (Cordell, Franklin) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Stipulated MOTION to Stay re #1 Notice of Removal, , filed by Defendant Affiliated FM Insurance Company. (Bentson, Daniel) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER: This case is hereby transferred to the Honorable Barbara J. Rothstein. All future pleadings shall bear the case number C22-0755BJR. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (LH) (cc: Judge Robart chambers via ECF ad hoc) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE of Docket Text Modification re 5 Order Reassigning Case: Entry stricken due to clerical error. Corrected entry with Minute Order attached to follow. (LH) (cc: Judge Robart chambers via ECF ad hoc) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER: REASSIGNING CASE. This case is hereby transferred to the Honorable Barbara J. Rothstein. All future pleadings shall bear the case number C22-0755BJR. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (LH) Modified to strike entry on 6/2/2022. Clerical error made when posting to docket (LH) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketNOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/10/2022. (JWC) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (JWC) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketJudge James L. Robart added. (JWC) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent FMIC Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Factory Mutual Insurance Company for Affiliated FM Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company (Bentson, Daniel) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Affiliated FM Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bentson, Daniel) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 22-2-03945-1; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7575564) Attorney Daniel Rahn Bentson added to party Affiliated FM Insurance Company(pty:dft), filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bentson, Daniel) (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/6/2022 due to malformed PDF) (CDA). (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AFFILIATED FM INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Rahn Bentson