This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:18:23 (UTC).

Evergreen East Cooperative v. Bottomley Evergreens & Farms, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Evergreen East Cooperative filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Bottomley Evergreens Farms, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Analisa Torres. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05360

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Analisa Torres

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider

EVERGREEN EAST COOPERATIVE

Defendant

BOTTOMLEY EVERGREENS & FARMS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider and Defendant Attorneys

David Blum

Attorney at Law Office David Blum

286 Madison Avenue, Suite 1802

New York, NY 10123

Ross M Babbitt

Attorney at Ross M. Babbitt CO., LPA

1382 West 9Th Street, Suite 220

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Affidavit of Ross M. Babbitt in support of motion to appear pro hac vice

6 #3

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Blum, David) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against BOTTOMLEY EVERGREENS & FARMS, INC.. Document filed by EVERGREEN EAST COOPERATIVE.(Blum, David) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Bottomley Evergreens & Farms, Inc. waiver sent on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. Document filed by Evergreen East Cooperative. (Babbitt, Ross) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/11/2019) (mro) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#3

(#3) INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/4/2019 at 11:10 AM in Courtroom 15D of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/11/2019) (mro) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Ross Michael Babbitt to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Plaintiff. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17108355. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Evergreen East Cooperative. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ross M. Babbitt in support of motion to appear pro hac vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Babbitt, Ross) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#1

(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against BOTTOMLEY EVERGREENS & FARMS, INC.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17041829)Document filed by BOTTOMLEY EVERGREENS & FARMS, INC..(Blum, David) Modified on 6/10/2019 (jgo). (Entered: 06/07/2019)

6 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Bottomley Evergreens & Farms, Inc. waiver sent on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. Document filed by Evergreen East Cooperative. (Babbitt, Ross) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Ross Michael Babbitt to Appear Pro Hac Vice: GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (DCM) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Ross Michael Babbitt to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Plaintiff. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17108355. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.>/. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Ross Michael Babbitt to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Plaintiff. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17108355. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Evergreen East Cooperative. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ross M. Babbitt in support of motion to appear pro hac vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Babbitt, Ross) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Blum, David) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/11/2019) (mro) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/4/2019 at 11:10 AM in Courtroom 15D of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/11/2019) (mro) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Blum. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Evergreen East Cooperative; Bottomley Evergreens & Farms, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David Blum. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $100000000; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9999000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney David Blum. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against BOTTOMLEY EVERGREENS & FARMS, INC.. Document filed by EVERGREEN EAST COOPERATIVE.(Blum, David) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against BOTTOMLEY EVERGREENS & FARMS, INC.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17041829)Document filed by BOTTOMLEY EVERGREENS & FARMS, INC..(Blum, David) Modified on 6/10/2019 (jgo). (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.