This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/28/2023 at 09:53:13 (UTC).

Everett v. G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 Everett filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Alan D Albright and Derek T. Gilliland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01225

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

Referral Judge

Derek T. Gilliland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jill Everett

Defendants

G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc.

Securitas Critical Infrastructure Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Clifton Alexander

Alan Clifton Gordon

Austin W. Anderson

Carter T. Hastings

Lauren E. Braddy

Defendant Attorney

Kelly Elisabeth Eisenlohr-Moul

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jill Everett. (Alexander, William) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc., Securitas Critical Infrastructure Services, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jill Everett as to G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc.. Waiver sent on 12/6/2022, answer due 2/6/2023. (Alexander, William) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelly Elisabeth Eisenlohr-Moul on behalf of G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. . Attorney Kelly Elisabeth Eisenlohr-Moul added to party G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. (pty:dft) (Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelly Elisabeth Eisenlohr-Moul on behalf of G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. . Attorney Kelly Elisabeth Eisenlohr-Moul added to party G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. (pty:dft) (Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jill Everett as to G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc.. Waiver sent on 12/6/2022, answer due 2/6/2023. (Alexander, William) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc., Securitas Critical Infrastructure Services, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE (lad) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jill Everett. (Alexander, William) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16795106), filed by Jill Everett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, William) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less