This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/16/2019 at 07:55:27 (UTC).

Evenson v. St. Jude Children's Research Hospital

Case Summary

On 02/15/2019 Evenson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against St Jude Children's Research Hospital. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Charmiane G. Claxton, Mark S. Norris and Thomas L. Parker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02115

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

Presiding Judges

Mark S. Norris

Thomas L. Parker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kristne A Evenson

Defendant

St. Jude Children's Research Hospital

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kathleen L. Caldwell

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF KATHLEEN L. CALDWELL

Lipscomb & Pitts Building, 2670 Union Extended, Suite 110

Memphis, TN 38112

Defendant Attorneys

Gary Scott Peeples

Attorney at Burch, Porter & Johnson, PLLC

130 North Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103

Lisa A. Krupicka

Attorney at BURCH PORTER & JOHNSON

130 N. Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103-2217

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Summons

#2

#6

#7

#8

#9

9 #1

Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss

#10

#11

#12

#13

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #10 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 4/8/2019. (pab) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Judge Thomas L. Parker added. Judge Mark S. Norris no longer assigned to case. (jae) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case transferred to Judge Thomas L. Parker. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 03/26/2019. (Mark S. Norris) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Stay by Kristne A Evenson. (Caldwell, Kathleen) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by St. Jude Children's Research Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Scott Peeples on behalf of St. Jude Children's Research Hospital (Peeples, Gary) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa A. Krupicka on behalf of St. Jude Children's Research Hospital (Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to St. Jude Children's Research Hospital. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against St. Jude Children's Research Hospital (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2993169), filed by Kristne A Evenson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Caldwell, Kathleen) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST JUDE CHILDRENS RESEARCH HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa A. Krupicka

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary Scott Peeples