This case was last updated from PACER on 09/19/2021 at 08:09:22 (UTC).

Evelyn Wong v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 07/21/2021 Evelyn Wong filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale S. Fischer and John D. Early. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05905

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Evelyn Wong

Defendant

UNUM Life Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brent Dorian Brehm

Attorney at Kantor and Kantor LLP

19839 Nordhoff Street

Northridge, CA 91324

Glenn R Kantor

Attorney at Kantor and Kantor LLP

19839 Nordhoff Street

Northridge, CA 91324

Defendant Attorneys

Peter J Felsenfeld

Attorney at Hinshaw and Culbertson LLP

One California Street 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Robert E Hess

Attorney at Hinshaw and Culbertson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, (Hess, Robert) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#13

(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America identifying Unum Group as Corporate Parent. (Hess, Robert) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.(Hess, Robert) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America answer now due 9/15/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Robert E Hess added to party UNUM Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Hess, Robert) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Evelyn Wong, upon Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America served on 7/26/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Stauss - Authorized Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brehm, Brent) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (et) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#4

(#4) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Evelyn Wong, (Brehm, Brent) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Evelyn Wong. (Brehm, Brent) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Evelyn Wong. (Brehm, Brent) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31669205 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Evelyn Wong. (Attorney Brent Dorian Brehm added to party Evelyn Wong(pty:pla))(Brehm, Brent) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, (Hess, Robert) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America identifying Unum Group as Corporate Parent. (Hess, Robert) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.(Hess, Robert) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America answer now due 9/15/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Robert E Hess added to party UNUM Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Hess, Robert) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Evelyn Wong, upon Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America served on 7/26/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Stauss - Authorized Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brehm, Brent) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (et) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Evelyn Wong, (Brehm, Brent) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Evelyn Wong. (Brehm, Brent) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Evelyn Wong. (Brehm, Brent) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31669205 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Evelyn Wong. (Attorney Brent Dorian Brehm added to party Evelyn Wong(pty:pla))(Brehm, Brent) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Unum Life Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter J. Felsenfeld

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert E Hess