This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/10/2021 at 07:51:42 (UTC).

Evans v. Triumph Aerostructures LLC

Case Summary

On 11/11/2020 Evans filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Triumph Aerostructures LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are A. Joe Fish and Sam A. Lindsay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03368

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

A. Joe Fish

Sam A. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lawrence Evans

Defendant

Triumph Aerostructures LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Wesley Gould

Attorney at Rochelle McCullough, LLP

325 N St Paul Street, Suite 4500

Dallas, TX 75201

Christian Jenkins

Attorney at Law Offices of Christian Jenkins PC

1307-B West Abram St Suite 100

Arlington, TX 76013

Greg H Bevel

Attorney at Rochelle McCullough LLP

325 North Saint Paul Street, Ste 4500

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorneys

James Thomas McBride

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins

Suite 500, 8117 Preston Road, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75225

Robyn M Funk

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC

8117 Preston Road, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75225

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Lawrence Evans. (Bevel, Greg) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND STATUS REPORT: Status Report due by 1/7/2021. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 12/8/2020) (svc) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

3 #1

Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Substitute Co

#3

(#3) Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney, added attorney Greg H Bevel for Lawrence Evans. Motion filed by Lawrence Evans (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Substitute Counsel)Attorney Greg H Bevel added to party Lawrence Evans(pty:pla) (Bevel, Greg) Modified text on 11/12/2020 (mjr). (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Triumph Aerostructures LLC. (McBride, James) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

1 #3

Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) Index of State Court Filings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Triumph Aerostructures LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11347755) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Index of State Court Filings, #2 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (McBride, James) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Lawrence Evans. (Bevel, Greg) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND STATUS REPORT: Status Report due by 1/7/2021. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 12/8/2020) (svc) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #3 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Accordingly, Christian Jenkins and the Law Offices of Christian Jenkins, P.C. are relieved of any further obligation to or representation of Plaintiff Lawrence Evans ("Plaintiff") in this case. Gregory H. Bevel and Wesley H. M. Gould of Rochelle McCullough, LLP are hereby substituted as counsel of record for Plaintiff in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 12/8/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • Docket(#5) Court Request for Recusal: Senior Judge A. Joe Fish recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Sam A. Lindsay for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:20-cv-3368-L. (ctf) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney, added attorney Greg H Bevel for Lawrence Evans. Motion filed by Lawrence Evans (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Substitute Counsel)Attorney Greg H Bevel added to party Lawrence Evans(pty:pla) (Bevel, Greg) Modified text on 11/12/2020 (mjr). (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Triumph Aerostructures LLC. (McBride, James) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Triumph Aerostructures LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11347755) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Index of State Court Filings, #2 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (McBride, James) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRIUMPH AEROSTRUCTURES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Thomas McBride

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robyn M. Funk