This case was last updated from PACER on 10/04/2021 at 07:35:17 (UTC).

Evans v. Techalloy Company, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2021 Evans filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Techalloy Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip G. Reinhard and Margaret J. Schneider. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-50309

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip G. Reinhard

Referral Judge

Margaret J. Schneider

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Delores Ann Evans

Defendants

Techalloy Company, Inc.

Central Wire, Inc.

Central Wire Industries, Ltd.

CWI Holding, Inc.

Lincoln Electric Holdings, Inc.

USI Holding, Inc.

Arcelormittal International America, LLC

Arcelormittal USA Foundation, Inc.

Cleveland-Cliffs Steel, LLC

Gerry Roup

Henry Lopes

Richard Perlick

Richard Gustafson

Mike Grunthaner

David Plecner

Victor Polard

Carl Reed

Terry Taminausksas

Tom Hanewald

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephan David Blandin

Attorney at Romanucci & Blandin

321 North Clark Street, Suite 900

Chicago, IL 60654

Elise Marie Blandin

Attorney at Romanucci & Blandin, Llc

321 N Clark St, Suite 900

Chicago, IL 60654

Friedl John Jason

Attorney at Romanucci & Blandin, LLC

321 N Clark St Ste 900

Chicago, IL 60654

Joseph Edward Kolar

Attorney at Romanucci & Blandin, LLC

321 N. Clark Street, Suite 900

Chicago, IL 60654

Michael Raymond Grieco

Attorney at Romanucci & Blandin

321 N Clark St., Suite 900

Chicago, IL 60654

Michael Elliot Holden

Attorney at Romanucci & Blandin, LLC

321 N. Clark St., Suite 900

Chicago, IL 60654

Defendant Attorneys

David Edward Kawala

Attorney at Swanson, Martin & Bell, LLP

330 North Wabash, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60611

David A. Kanter

Attorney at Swanson, Martin & Bell

330 North Wabash, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60611

Eric Jonathan Skwiat

Attorney at Swanson, Martin & Bell, Llp

330 N Wabash, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60611

Isabella Adriana Masini

Attorney at Swanson, Martin & Bell Llp

330 N. Wabash, 3300

Chicago, IL 60611

Mark Joseph Mcloughlin

Attorney at Swanson, Martin & Bell, Llp

330 N Wabash, Ste 3300

Chicago, IL 60611

Stephen P Ellenbecker

Attorney at Johnson & Bell, Ltd

33 W. Monroe, Suite 2700

Chicago, IL 60603

Other Attorneys

Kingshuk K Roy

Attorney at Purcell & Wardrope Chtd.

10 S. Lasalle, Suite 1200

Chicago, IL 60603

Kolton Allen Reed

Attorney at Purcell & Wardrope, Chtd.

10 South Lasalle Street, Suite 1200

Chicago, IL 60603

Michael J McGowan

Attorney at SmithAmundsen LLC

150 North Michigan Avenue, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60601

Craig Andrew Cappas

Attorney at Smith Amundsen, L.L.C.

150 North Michigan Avenue, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60601

Jeffrey Irving Young

Attorney at SmithAmundsen LLC

150 N. Michigan Avenue, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60601

Daniel K. Cray

Attorney at Cray Huber Horstman Heil & VanAusdal LLC

303 West Madison Street, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60606

Maura Yusof

Attorney at CRAY HUBER HORSTMAN HEIL & VanAUSDAL LLC

330 West Madison Street, Suite 4200

Chicago, IL 60606

David F. Ryan

Attorney at Patton & Ryan, LLC

330 North Wabash Avenue, #3800

Chicago, IL 60611

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#56

#55

#54

#53

#52

#51

#50

#49

#48

#47

#8

#7

#6

#5

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nortek Global HVAC, LLC by Michael John Kanute (Kanute, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nortek Global HVAC, LLC by Ruben Ignacio Gonzalez (Gonzalez, Ruben) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Defendant Rangaire Manufacturing Company's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Until After Resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #53 , is denied as moot. The Court directs Defendant's attention to docket entry #47 , granting this relief to ALL Defendants. Mailed notice. (jxk) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) MOTION by Defendant Rangaire Manufacturing Company, LP for extension of time Defendant Rangaire Manufacturing Company's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Until After Resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Rachlis, Michael) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rangaire Manufacturing Company, LP by Michael Rachlis (Rachlis, Michael) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rangaire Manufacturing Company, LP by Kevin Buckley Duff (Duff, Kevin) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Viking Chemical Company by Craig Andrew Cappas (Cappas, Craig) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Viking Chemical Company by Jeffrey Irving Young (Young, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Viking Chemical Company by Michael J McGowan (McGowan, Michael) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Defendant Henry Lopes' Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Until After Resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #45 , is granted. The Court applies this ruling to ALL Defendants ALL Defendants are to respond to Plaintiff's complaint 21 days after resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Additionally, as to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #18 , ALL Defendants are directed to respond to the Motion to Remand 21 days after the last of the Defendants are served and appear. The Court draws the parties' attention to minute entry #46 , granting Plaintiff until 12/01/21 to effectuate service on the unserved defendants. Mailed notice. (jxk) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Delores Ann Evans by Stephan David Blandin (Blandin, Stephan) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Delores Ann Evans by Elise Marie Blandin (Blandin, Elise) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Delores Ann Evans by Michael Raymond Grieco (Grieco, Michael) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Central Wire, Inc. by David A. Kanter (Kanter, David) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Central Wire, Inc. by Eric Jonathan Skwiat (Skwiat, Eric) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard and Honorable Margaret J. Schneider. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider. Case assignment: Direct assignment. (pg, ) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants C P Chemicals, Inc. f/k/a Southern California Chemical Company, Inc., Phibro-Tech, Inc. by Kolton Allen Reed (Reed, Kolton) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants C P Chemicals, Inc. f/k/a Southern California Chemical Company, Inc., Phibro-Tech, Inc. by Kingshuk K Roy (Roy, Kingshuk) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Roy, Kingshuk) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from McHenry County, case number (21 LA 000182) filed by C P Chemicals, Inc. f/k/a Southern California Chemical Company, Inc., Phibro-Tech, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18538367. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Roy, Kingshuk) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Central Wire Industries, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Techalloy Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where USI HOLDINGS CORPORATION is a litigant