This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2019 at 07:52:30 (UTC).

Evans v. Salmonsen et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2019 Evans filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Salmonsen. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian Morris and John Johnston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00034

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian Morris

Referral Judge

John Johnston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Evans

Bridgewater, MA 02324

Defendants

Ken Marthaller

James Salmonsen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Roger J. Renville

Attorney at MONTANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Po Box 201301, 5 Last Chance Gulch

Helena, MT 59620-1301

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Roger J. Renville on behalf of All Defendants (Renville, Roger) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ken Marthaller, James Salmonsen. (Renville, Roger) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Evans. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 5/31/2019. Mailed to Evans and OCCC. (TAG) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Directing Clerk to Serve defendant(s). Waiver of Service of Summons is due within 30 days of this Order; if executed, an answer or other appropriate motion is due within 60 days of this Order.( Waiver of Service due by 7/1/2019, Notice of Appearance due by 8/1/2019). Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 5/31/2019. Mailed to Evans; documents forwarded to counsel for DOC as directed (TAG) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Evans with docket sheet. (TAG) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by Anthony Evans. (TAG) Modified on 5/31/2019: complaint deemed filed (TAG). (Entered: 05/13/2019)

1 #2

Account Statement

1 #1

Supplement

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Anthony Evans. Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Account Statement) (TAG) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Roger J. Renville on behalf of All Defendants (Renville, Roger) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ken Marthaller, James Salmonsen. (Renville, Roger) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Evans. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 5/31/2019. Mailed to Evans and OCCC. (TAG) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Directing Clerk to Serve defendant(s). Waiver of Service of Summons is due within 30 days of this Order; if executed, an answer or other appropriate motion is due within 60 days of this Order.( Waiver of Service due by 7/1/2019, Notice of Appearance due by 8/1/2019). Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 5/31/2019. Mailed to Evans; documents forwarded to counsel for DOC as directed (TAG) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Evans with docket sheet. (TAG) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by Anthony Evans. (TAG) Modified on 5/31/2019: complaint deemed filed (TAG). (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Anthony Evans. Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Account Statement) (TAG) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less