This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/17/2021 at 08:26:43 (UTC).

Evans v. Maplebear Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 Evans filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Maplebear Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Greg Kays. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00428

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Greg Kays

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melissa Evans

Defendants

Maplebear Inc., d/b/a Instacart

Maplebear Inc. doing business as Instacart

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam M. Evans

Attorney at Brenes Law Group, P.C.

1200 Main St, Suite 2120

Kansas City, MO 64105

Charles Regan

Attorney at Regan Law Firm, LLC

1821 Wyandotte Street, Ste. 200

Kansas City, MO 64108

Defendant Attorneys

Steven Shredl

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

One Us Bank Plaza

Saint Louis, MO 63101

Christopher M. Hohn

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP - StL

One Us Bank Plaza

St. Louis, MO 63101

Kimberly Bousquet

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

One U.S. Bank Plaza, Ste 27Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

#13

12 #2

Exhibit A to Declaration of D. Tonti (Terms of Service)

12 #1

Exhibit 1 (Declaration of D. Tonti)

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#6

5 #1

MAP General Order

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Notice of Removal

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice to State Court

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Docket & Pleadings

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 motion for extension of time to file response/reply re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/30/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 8/9/2021 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (law clerk) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #12 Suggestions in Support of Motion, #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Adam M. Evans on behalf of Melissa Evans. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/23/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #12 , #11 ) (Evans, Adam) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUGGESTIONS in support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Steven Shredl on behalf of Defendant Maplebear Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of D. Tonti), #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of D. Tonti (Terms of Service))(Related document(s) #11 ) (Shredl, Steven) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Steven Shredl on behalf of Maplebear Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/9/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shredl, Steven) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of appearance by Kimberly Bousquet on behalf of Maplebear Inc. (Attorney Kimberly Bousquet added to party Maplebear Inc.(pty:dft))(Bousquet, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 8/13/2021. Proposed scheduling order due by 8/27/2021. Signed on 7/13/21 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of appearance by Christopher M. Hohn on behalf of Maplebear Inc. (Attorney Christopher M. Hohn added to party Maplebear Inc.(pty:dft))(Hohn, Christopher) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 motion to continue. Answer due on or before July 26, 2021. Signed on 6/23/2021 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (law clerk) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to continue Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Steven Shredl on behalf of Maplebear Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/7/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shredl, Steven) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of appearance by Steven Shredl on behalf of Maplebear Inc., d/b/a Instacart (Shredl, Steven) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Steven Shredl on behalf of Defendant Maplebear Inc., d/b/a Instacart.(Shredl, Steven) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal to Plaintiff by Maplebear Inc., d/b/a Instacart (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal)(Shredl, Steven) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County County, case number 2016-CV17865, filed by Steven Shredl. Filing fee $402, receipt number BMOWDC-7460205. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Docket & Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shredl, Steven) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAPLEBEAR INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam M. Evans