0:22-CV-62440
12/30/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Property - Personal Property Fraud
Raag Singhal
Emily Evans
DeMert Brands, LLC
Sarah Nicole Westcot
Carl V. Malmstrom
D Matthew Allen
Nathaniel Garrett Foell
Thomas Meeks
Patricia Marie Patino
(#25) ORDER: This case is STAYED for a period not to exceed thirty (30) days. (Status Report due by 3/6/2023.) Motion Granted: #19 Unopposed MOTION to Stay filed by DeMert Brands, LLC. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/7/2023. See attached document for full details. (pc) (Entered: 02/08/2023)
(#22) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathaniel Garrett Foell on behalf of DeMert Brands, LLC. Attorney Nathaniel Garrett Foell added to party DeMert Brands, LLC(pty:dft). (Foell, Nathaniel) (Entered: 02/02/2023)
(#21) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by D Matthew Allen on behalf of DeMert Brands, LLC. Attorney D Matthew Allen added to party DeMert Brands, LLC(pty:dft). (Allen, D) (Entered: 02/02/2023)
(#20) First Corporate Disclosure Statement by DeMert Brands, LLC identifying Corporate Parent NYM Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Main Post Growth Capital, L.P., Other Affiliate Main Post Growth Capital II, L.P., Other Affiliate MPGC NYM Co-Investment, LP, Other Affiliate BP-RP Investments, Inc. for DeMert Brands, LLC (Patino, Patricia) (Entered: 02/02/2023)
(#19) Unopposed MOTION to Stay by DeMert Brands, LLC. Responses due by 2/16/2023 (Patino, Patricia) (Entered: 02/02/2023)
(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patricia Marie Patino on behalf of DeMert Brands, LLC. Attorney Patricia Marie Patino added to party DeMert Brands, LLC(pty:dft). (Patino, Patricia) (Entered: 02/02/2023)
(#16) ORDER granting #14 Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying #15 Motion to Stay as Moot. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 1/20/2023. See attached document for full details. (pc) (Entered: 01/22/2023)
Exhibit A - DE 21 Defendant's Unopposed & Amended Motion to Stay with Statu
Main Document
(#16) ORDER granting #14 Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying #15 Motion to Stay as Moot. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 1/20/2023. See attached document for full details. (pc) (Entered: 01/22/2023)
No Description Available
No Description Available
No Description Available
*Restricted*
Main Document Public Docket Sheet
No Description Available
Docket(#25) ORDER: This case is STAYED for a period not to exceed thirty (30) days. (Status Report due by 3/6/2023.) Motion Granted: #19 Unopposed MOTION to Stay filed by DeMert Brands, LLC. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/7/2023. See attached document for full details. (pc) (Entered: 02/08/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#24) PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONSWithin SEVEN (7) DAYS of entry of an appearance, each party, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties shall not include Judge Singhal or the paired magistrate judges as interested parties unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/7/2023. (eca) (Entered: 02/07/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#23) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Exhibits to pleadings and motions shall be docketed in accordance with the Courts CM/ECF procedures, Rule 3L.(2): (2) Describing an Attachment to a Docket EntryA party filing an attachment to a document shall select one of the prescribed attachment categories from the drop-down menu (e.g., affidavit, transcript), provide an alphabetical or numerical designation (e.g., Exhibit A, Exhibit 1), and descriptively name each attachment (e.g., Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Boo Radley) in a manner that enables the Court to easily locate and distinguish attachments. (Emphasis added.) Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/7/2023. (eca) (Entered: 02/07/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#22) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathaniel Garrett Foell on behalf of DeMert Brands, LLC. Attorney Nathaniel Garrett Foell added to party DeMert Brands, LLC(pty:dft). (Foell, Nathaniel) (Entered: 02/02/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#21) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by D Matthew Allen on behalf of DeMert Brands, LLC. Attorney D Matthew Allen added to party DeMert Brands, LLC(pty:dft). (Allen, D) (Entered: 02/02/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#20) First Corporate Disclosure Statement by DeMert Brands, LLC identifying Corporate Parent NYM Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Main Post Growth Capital, L.P., Other Affiliate Main Post Growth Capital II, L.P., Other Affiliate MPGC NYM Co-Investment, LP, Other Affiliate BP-RP Investments, Inc. for DeMert Brands, LLC (Patino, Patricia) (Entered: 02/02/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#19) Unopposed MOTION to Stay by DeMert Brands, LLC. Responses due by 2/16/2023 (Patino, Patricia) (Entered: 02/02/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patricia Marie Patino on behalf of DeMert Brands, LLC. Attorney Patricia Marie Patino added to party DeMert Brands, LLC(pty:dft). (Patino, Patricia) (Entered: 02/02/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#17) Case Transferred to Judge Raag Singhal. Senior Judge Paul C. Huck no longer assigned to the case- Per DE #16 (asl) (Entered: 01/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#16) ORDER granting #14 Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying #15 Motion to Stay as Moot. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 1/20/2023. See attached document for full details. (pc) (Entered: 01/22/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Agreed motion for Transfer of Action to Southern District of Florida Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1404 #6 is granted. The Clerk is directed to transfer this action to the Southern District of Florida. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 12/14/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Emily Evans to transfer case (Agreed Motion for Transfer of Action to Southern District of Florida Pursuant to 28 USC 1404) (Malmstrom, Carl) (Entered: 12/06/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) ORDER DEEMING MOTION WITHDRAWN. (aee, ) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) AMENDED Proof of Service by DeMert Brands, LLC. (aee, ) (Entered: 11/29/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) MOTION for transfer of actions to the Southern District of Florida pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for consolidated or Coordinated Pretrial Proceedings by DeMert Brands, LLC (Exhibits). (aee, ) (Entered: 11/29/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Emily Evans by Carl V. Malmstrom (Malmstrom, Carl) (Entered: 11/15/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant DeMert Brands, LLC (smb, ) (Entered: 11/14/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jb, ) (Entered: 11/10/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jb, ) (Entered: 11/10/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT (Class Action) filed by Emily Evans; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20037398. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Malmstrom, Carl) (Entered: 11/10/2022)
[-] Read Less